Micron Technology, Inc. et al v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Micron Memory Taiwan Co., Ltd., Micron Technology Taiwan, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Asia Pte. Ltd. and Micron Semiconductor Asia Operations Pte. Ltd.
Defendant: Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited, Chubb Underwriting Agencies Ltd., Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, AXIS Managing Agency Limited, Aegis London Holdings LTD, Hiscox Insurance Company LTD, China Re UK Ltd., Chaucer Syndicates Limited, Beazley Group Ltd., Argo Managing Agency 1200, Liberty Corporate Capital LTD, Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Antares Underwriting Limited, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd., Ironshore, Inc., Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH and MS Amlin Plc
Case Number: 3:2018cv07689
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/19/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The court extends the moving defendants thirty days from the date of this order (i.e., until March 1, 2019) to respond to the complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY (re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Motion and Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to the Complaint; Declaration of Lauren M. Case In Support of Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to the Complaint; Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge ) Reply in Support of Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to the Complaint filed byAXIS Managing Agency Limited, Aegis London Holdings LTD, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency 1200, Beazley Group Ltd., Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Ltd., Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd., Hiscox Insurance Company LTD, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital LTD, MS Amlin Plc, Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited. (Case, Lauren) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Motion and Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to the Complaint; Declaration of Lauren M. Case In Support of Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to the Complaint; Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge ) OPPOSITION filed byMicron Memory Taiwan Co., Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Asia Operations Pte. Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Asia Pte. Ltd., Micron Technology Taiwan, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin H. Myers, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Martin H. Myers, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Martin H. Myers, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Martin H. Myers, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Martin H. Myers, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Martin H. Myers, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Martin H. Myers)(Myers, Martin) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler regarding #12 Motion to Shorten Time. The defendants ask the court to order the plaintiffs to file by January 29, 2019 any opposition they may have to the defendants' motion to enlarge the time they have to respond to the complaint, ECF No. #13 . Under the local rules, the plaintiffs have four days, which here is January 29, 2019, to respond to the defendants' motion to enlarge. N.D. Cal. Civ. L.R. 6-3(b). The plaintiffs also said that they would respond today. Under the circumstances, the court terminates the motion to shorten the time as moot and will consider both filings as soon as the plaintiffs file their response. If the court needs additional information, it will ask for it and in the unlikely event that a hearing is needed, will calendar it for January 31, 2019 and allow telephone participation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Motion and Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to the Complaint; Declaration of Lauren M. Case In Support of Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to the Complaint; Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge Time To Respond to the Complaint filed by AXIS Managing Agency Limited, Aegis London Holdings LTD, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency 1200, Beazley Group Ltd., Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Ltd., Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd., Hiscox Insurance Company LTD, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital LTD, MS Amlin Plc, Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Case, Lauren) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Shorten Time Notice of Motion and Motion to ShortenTime for Hearing on Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by AXIS Managing Agency Limited, Aegis London Holdings LTD, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency 1200, Beazley Group Ltd., Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Ltd., Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd., Hiscox Insurance Company LTD, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital LTD, MS Amlin Plc, Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Case, Lauren) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Lauren M. Case re Motion to Enjoin. (Case, Lauren) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend the Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by AXIS Managing Agency Limited, Aegis London Holdings LTD, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency 1200, Beazley Group Ltd., Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Ltd., Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd., Hiscox Insurance Company LTD, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital LTD, MS Amlin Plc, Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited. (Case, Lauren) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Micron Memory Taiwan Co., Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Asia Operations Pte. Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Asia Pte. Ltd., Micron Technology Taiwan, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc... (Myers, Martin) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to AXIS Managing Agency Limited, Aegis London Holdings LTD, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Antares Underwriting Limited, Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Argo Managing Agency 1200, Beazley Group Ltd., Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK), Chaucer Syndicates Limited, China Re UK Ltd., Chubb Underwriting Agencies Ltd., Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd., Hiscox Insurance Company LTD, Ironshore, Inc., Liberty Corporate Capital LTD, MS Amlin Plc, Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 24, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Myers, Martin) (Filed on 12/24/2018)
December 24, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/7/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Micron Memory Taiwan Co., Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Asia Operations Pte. Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Asia Pte. Ltd., Micron Technology Taiwan, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc. (Myers, Martin) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Micron Memory Taiwan Co., Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Asia Operations Pte. Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Asia Pte. Ltd., Micron Technology Taiwan, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc.. (Myers, Martin) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12951219.). Filed byMicron Memory Taiwan Co., Ltd., Micron Technology, Inc., Micron Technology Taiwan, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Asia Pte. Ltd., Micron Semiconductor Asia Operations Pte. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Myers, Martin) (Filed on 12/21/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micron Technology, Inc. et al v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Memory Taiwan Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Martin H. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Technology Taiwan, Inc.
Represented By: Martin H. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Martin H. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Semiconductor Asia Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Martin H. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micron Semiconductor Asia Operations Pte. Ltd.
Represented By: Martin H. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Underwriting Agency Limited
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Underwriting Agencies Ltd.
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argenta Syndicate Management Limited
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXIS Managing Agency Limited
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis London Holdings LTD
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company LTD
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Re UK Ltd.
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaucer Syndicates Limited
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley Group Ltd.
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo Managing Agency 1200
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Corporate Capital LTD
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antares Underwriting Limited
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd.
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canopius Managing Agents Limited
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathedral Underwriting Limited (UK)
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS Amlin Plc
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?