Personalized Media Communications LLC v. TCL Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Personalized Media Communications LLC
Defendant: TCL Multimedia Technology Holdings Ltd. and TCL Corp.
Respondent: Sigma Designs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018mc80118
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/14/2018 9:08:14 AM ]. File Size [ 5952 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:24 ]. (courtspeak).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Close the Case and Denying the Motion to Enforce as Moot by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, ***Civil Case Terminated. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Update by Personalized Media Communications LLC. (Xi, Meng) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Motion to Enforce or Transfer Subpoena by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: denying #1 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 8/14/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding the motion to enforce subpoena. Hearing held. The Court takes the motion under submission. FTR Time: 9:08 - 9:20 Plaintiff Attorneys: Meng Xi and Dmitry Kheyfits Defendant Attorney: Monica Hernandez (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 REPLY (re #1 MOTION to Enforce the Subpoena Against Sigma Designs, Inc, or Alternatively, to Transfer Enforcement ) Reply To Sigma Design, Inc.s Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Enforce The Subpoena Against Sigma, Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Enforcement filed byPersonalized Media Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meng Xi In Support of Reply To Sigma Design, Inc.s Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Enforce The Subpoena Against Sigma, Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Enforcement, #2 Exhibit A to Meng Xi Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Meng Xi Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Meng Xi Declaration, #5 Declaration of Elisha Barron In Support of Reply To Sigma Design, Inc.s Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Enforce The Subpoena Against Sigma, Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Enforcement)(Xi, Meng) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1 MOTION to Enforce the Subpoena Against Sigma Designs, Inc, or Alternatively, to Transfer Enforcement ) filed bySigma Designs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew M. Phillips in Support of Sigma's Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrew M. Phillips, #3 Declaration of David A. Jakopin in Support of Sigma's Opposition, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of David A. Jakopin, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration of David A. Jakopin, #6 Exhibit C to Declaration of David A. Jakopin, #7 Exhibit D to Declaration of David A. Jakopin, #8 Exhibit E to Declaration of David A. Jakopin, #9 Exhibit F to Declaration of David A. Jakopin, #10 Exhibit G to Declaration of David A. Jakopin, #11 Exhibit H to Declaration of David A. Jakopin, #12 Exhibit I to Declaration of David A. Jakopin)(Jakopin, David) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Personalized Media Communications LLC re #1 MOTION to Enforce the Subpoena Against Sigma Designs, Inc, or Alternatively, to Transfer Enforcement, #2 Notice (Other), #3 Order, Set Hearings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Xi, Meng) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications LLC re #1 MOTION to Enforce the Subpoena Against Sigma Designs, Inc, or Alternatively, to Transfer Enforcement Notice of Hearing for August 7, 2018 (Xi, Meng) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Enforce the Subpoena Against Sigma Designs, Inc, or Alternatively, to Transfer Enforcement filed by Personalized Media Communications LLC. Responses due by 7/30/2018. Replies due by 8/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Meng Xi declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Meng Xi declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Meng Xi declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Meng Xi declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Meng Xi declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Meng Xi declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Meng Xi declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Meng Xi declaration, #10 Proposed Order)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2018: #11 Receipt) (cpS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Personalized Media Communications LLC v. TCL Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Multimedia Technology Holdings Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Personalized Media Communications LLC
Represented By: Dmitry Kheyfits
Represented By: Meng Xi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sigma Designs, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Jakopin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?