Viale et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp et al
Plaintiff: Debbie L. Viale and Amber Jacobs
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC, Grinnell LLC, Elementis Chemicals Inc, General Electric Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corp, Keenan Properties Inc., Crane Co., Qunitec Industries Inc., Calaveras Asbestos Ltd, Exxonmobile Corporation, Trane USA, AMEC Foster Wheeler USA Corporation, Allied Packing & Supply, A.W. Chesterton Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Soco-West, Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Kaiser Gypsum, Inc., SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems USA LLC, Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Calaveras Natural Resources Inc, Johnson Controls Inc, Anheuser-Busch, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide Inc, Shell Oil Company, Union Oil Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc., CBS Corporation and Santa Fe Braun, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00038
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Ann Haran (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 215 ANSWER to #181 Second Amended Complaint For Wrongful Death and Survival Actions - Asbestos by Santa Fe Braun, Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2019 Filing 214 NOTICE by Santa Fe Braun, Inc. re #211 Notice of Appearance DEFENDANT SANTA FE BRAUN INC'S RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 213 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Santa Fe Braun, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent 15375 Memorial Corporation for Santa Fe Braun, Inc.. re #211 Notice of Appearance (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2019 Filing 212 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Santa Fe Braun, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent 15375 Memorial Corporation for Santa Fe Braun, Inc.. re #211 Notice of Appearance and Notice of Interested Parties (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2019 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR SANTA FE BRAUN INC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS INC.< The complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to defendant Elementis Chemicals Inc., formerly known as Harcros Chemicals Inc., successor-in-interest to Harrisons < Crosfield (Pacific) Inc. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 13, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 209 Certificate of Interested Entities by Certainteed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie De Saint-Gobain, Other Affiliate DBMP LLC for Certainteed Corporation. Amended (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 208 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Re Dismissal of Defendant Elementis Chemicals Inc. filed by Elementis Chemicals Inc. (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ANHEUSER-BUSCH, LLC'S (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ANHEUSER-BUSCH INBEV WORLDWIDE INC.). The complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to Anheuser-Busch. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2019.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 206 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Defendant Anheuser-Busch, LLC's (Erroneously Sued as Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide Inc.) filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Kim, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 205 NOTICE by A.W. Chesterton Company of Partial Resolution of the Matter (Cormier, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 10, 2019 ***Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines re #204 Order : Jury Selection set for 8/27/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2020. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Close of Fact Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Dispositive Motion due by 5/29/2020. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Non-expert discovery cut-off is 3/2/2020. Plaintiffs' designation of experts due by 3/30/2020. Defendants' designation of experts due by 4/13/2019. Rebuttals disclosures due by 4/24/2020. Expert discovery cut-off is 5/15/2020. Dispositive Motion filing deadline is 5/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 10:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 8/27/2020 09:00 AM. Jury Trial (15-20 days) set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES. The trial date is continued from April 13, 2020, to August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #202 MOTION to Continue Trial and Related Dates. Opposition due by 10/21/2019. Reply due by 10/28/2019. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 202 MOTION to Continue Trial and Related Dates filed by Elementis Chemicals Inc, Exxonmobile Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, William) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 201 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Debbie L. Viale. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 200 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Further Status Conference held on 9/27/2019.Total Time in Court: 37 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Nectaria Belantis. Defendant Attorney: See Minutes for Roster. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of Partial Resolution of This Matter (Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 198 NOTICE by CBS Corporation of Partial Resolution (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE by General Electric Company of Partial Resolution (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kevin Douglas Jamison on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 195 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by Debbie L. Viale. (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Kaiser Gypsum, Inc. by Debbie L. Viale (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 193 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE FROM SEPTEMBER 20, 2019 TO SEPTEMBER 27, 2019 - Further Status Conference reset to 9/27/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Joint Status Conference Statement due by 9/27/2019.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Deborah Ann Smith for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation (Smith, Deborah) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT STATUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/5/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR REMAND; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 3, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 189 REPLY (re #182 MOTION to Remand RENEWED ) filed byDebbie L. Viale. (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 188 Joinder in #184 , #185 , #186 , #187 Co-Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (Estrada, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Filing 187 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #182 MOTION to Remand RENEWED ) Opposition filed byCalaveras Asbestos Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew L Sharp in Support of Calaveras Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibits in Support of Calaveras Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 6/17/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2019 Filing 186 Joinder re #184 Opposition/Response to Motion,, to Plaintiffs Renewed Motion to Remand by CBS Corporation. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 185 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #182 MOTION to Remand RENEWED ) filed byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 184 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #182 MOTION to Remand RENEWED ) filed byGeneral Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF DEREK S. JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR REMAND, #2 Exhibit A to Dec, #3 Exhibit B to Dec, #4 Exhibit C to Dec, #5 Exhibit D to Dec, #6 Exhibit E to Dec, #7 Proposed Order )(Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 6/17/2019) Modified on 6/18/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2019 Filing 183 Answer to #181 Second Amended Complaint byTrane USA. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 6/14/2019) Modified on 6/17/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2019 Filing 182 MOTION to Remand RENEWED filed by Debbie L. Viale. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 6/17/2019. Replies due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 181 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byDebbie L. Viale. (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 5/29/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint no later than May 31, 2019. All answers filed in response to the Amended Complaint shall be deemed responsive to the SAC. Any defendant that wishes to file an answer to the SAC, however, shall do so within fourteen days of the filing of the SAC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 21, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 179 REPLY (re #176 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ) filed byDebbie L. Viale. (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 178 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #176 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ) filed byAMEC Foster Wheeler USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Estrada, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 176 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Debbie L. Viale. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/10/2019. Replies due by 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 175 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum Inc., Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum Inc., Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum N.V., Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc. for Shell Oil Company. Defendant Shell Oil Company's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Petty, Ross) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety as a separate entry, adding Corporate Parent and/or Other Affili ates if necessary. Re:[174-1] Certification of Interested Entities, filed by Shell Oil Company. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
April 25, 2019 Filing 174 Defendant Shell Oil Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Actions - Asbestos ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byShell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY - NEEDS TO BE FILED SEPARATELY *** - Certification of Interested Entities)(Petty, Ross) (Filed on 4/25/2019) Modified on 4/26/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 24, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT CRANE CO. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 17, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 171 Answer to Amended Complaint byAir & Liquid Systems Corp. (Scadden, James) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 170 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crane Co. identifying Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate American Home Assurance Company, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Highlands Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lexington Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transit Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Transamerica Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of North America, Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Prudential Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Excess Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate American Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate American Centennial Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Continental, Other Affiliate Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Other Affiliate INA, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate The Home Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Century Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, Other Affiliate The Employer's Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, Other Affiliate Midland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Other Affiliate Mission Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Dairyland Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Centaur Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Integrity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Globe Indemnity, Other Affiliate Aetna, Other Affiliate New England Reinsurance Corporation, Other Affiliate The North River Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate AIU Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance of Wausau for Crane Co.. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 4/9/2019) Modified on 4/10/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2019 Filing 169 NOTICE by Crane Co. Notice of Filing State Court Answser (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 168 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Crane Co. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Edward Soskin and Geoffrey M. Davis (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 166 STIPULATION Request for DWOP Kellogg-Ferguson filed by Debbie L. Viale. (Paul, Joshua) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 165 STIPULATION Request for DWOP as to Quintec filed by Debbie L. Viale. (Paul, Joshua) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 164 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Debbie L. Viale Submission of Shell Proof of Service (Paul, Joshua) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/8/2019. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 162 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/5/2019., CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement Conference Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2019. Close of Expert Discovery due by 12/27/2019. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/21/2019. Plaintiff's Designation of Experts due by 11/12/2019. Defense Designation of Experts due by 11/25/2019. Dispositive Motion due by 1/10/2020. Rebuttal Reports due by 12/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Jury Selection set for 4/9/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Jury Trial (15-20 days) set for 4/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Further Status Conference set for 9/20/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney.Total Time in Court: 1:10. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Nectaria Belantis. Defendant Attorney: (See Attached Civil Minutes). Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE by Elementis Chemicals Inc Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival - Asbestos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. has been added for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company pursuant to docket no. 158. Counsel are reminded to add Corporate Parent/Other Affiliates when prompted to do so on the screen when filing Certificate of Interested Entities. Re: #157 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
April 3, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Aspericueta Notice of Appearance of P. Casey Mathews, Esq. on Behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Aspericueta Notice of Appearance of Michael E. Flynn-O'Brien on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 158 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 157 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to Plaintiffs Complaint)(Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison by Katherine P. Gardiner (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TRANE U.S. INC., UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, AND CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 153 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Debbie L. Viale . (Paul, Joshua) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER RE: ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The stipulation filed March 29, 2019, is approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 29, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE COPIES OF ALL AMENDMENTS SUBSTITUTING ANY ENTITY OR PERSON FOR DOE DEFENDANT. Plaintiffs are directed to file, no later than April 2, 2019, a copy of all amendments filed in state court by which any entity or person has been substituted for a "Doe." Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 29, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Denise Fitzpatrick (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 149 Proposed Order AND STIPULATION RE: ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Calaveras Asbestos Ltd, Calaveras Natural Resources Inc. (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 148 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (Estrada, Michael) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 147 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company, Other Affiliate DowDuPont, Inc. for Union Carbide Corporation. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 26 (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 146 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certainteed Corporation Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 26 (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metalclad Insulation Corporation Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 26 (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 144 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Debbie L. Viale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Paul, Joshua) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Debbie L. Viale (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical, #2 Exhibit Social Security Admin, #3 Exhibit Auth for Initial Disclosure)(Paul, Joshua) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 142 Proposed Order AND STIPULATION RE: ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Calaveras Asbestos Ltd. (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Counsel are reminded to add Corporate Parent and/or Other Affiliates when prompted to do so on the screen. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further ac tion is necessary. Re: #139 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
March 27, 2019 Filing 141 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gunter, W.) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE by Keenan Properties Inc. of Filing State Court Answer (Gunter, W.) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 139 Certificate of Interested Entities identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company, Corporate Parent DowDupont Inc. by Union Carbide Corporation (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 3/27/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dean Sentlinger (Sentlinger, Eric) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 136 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Calaveras Natural Resources, Inc.) (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2019) Modified on 3/18/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2019 Filing 135 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 134 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Miller, Anthony) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 133 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Metalclad Insulation LLC) (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 3/15/2019) Modified on 3/18/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2019 Filing 132 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 131 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 130 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Moley, Nell) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 129 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Goetz, Andy) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 128 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Goetz, Andy) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 127 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 126 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 125 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 124 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Allied Fluid Products Corp (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 123 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 122 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Park, Charles) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 121 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Scadden, James) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 120 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 119 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 118 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Johnson Controls Inc.) ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2019) Modified on 3/15/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2019 Filing 117 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Goulds Pumps LLC) ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2019) Modified on 3/15/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2019 Filing 116 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Grinnell LLC) ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2019) Modified on 3/15/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 13, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Re: #114 Request for ADR Phone Conference filed by Debbie L. Viale. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
March 12, 2019 Filing 114 Letter from Peter C. Beirne. (Paul, Joshua) (Filed on 3/12/2019) Modified on 3/13/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 1, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 111 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keenan Properties Inc. and Certification of Interested Parties Pursuant to Local Rule 7-1.1 (Gunter, W.) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Joseph Gunter for Keenan Properties, Inc. (Gunter, W.) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 20, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 108 REPLY (re #72 Amended MOTION to Remand ) filed byDebbie L. Viale. (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE by Metalclad Insulation Corporation of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE by Certainteed Corporation of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint (Huynh, Kathy) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Sinclair Miller (Miller, Anthony) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DIRECTING SPECIFIED DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 13, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 103 DECLARATION of Samuel A. Forman in support of #97 Opposition/Response filed byAir & Liquid Systems Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37 In Support of Forman Declaration, #2 Errata 38-39 In Support of Forman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 40 In Support of Forman Declaration, #4 Exhibit 41-42 In Support of Forman Declaration, #5 Exhibit 43-44 In Support of Forman Declaration, #6 Exhibit 45-49 In Support of Forman Declaration, #7 Exhibit 50 In Support of Forman Declaration, #8 Exhibit 51-52 In Support of Forman Declaration, #9 Exhibit 53-54 In Support of Forman Declaration)(Related document(s) #101 ) (Scadden, James) (Filed on 2/12/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Samuel A. Forman in support of #97 Opposition/Response filed byAir & Liquid Systems Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18-19 In Support of Forman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 20-21 In Support of Forman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 22 In Support of Forman Declaration, #4 Exhibit 23 In Support of Forman Declaration, #5 Exhibit 24-25 In Support of Forman Declaration, #6 Exhibit 26-28 In Support of Forman Declaration, #7 Exhibit 29-31 In Support of Forman Declaration, #8 Exhibit 32-34 In Support of Forman Declaration, #9 Exhibit 35-36 In Support of Forman Declaration)(Related document(s) #101 ) (Scadden, James) (Filed on 2/12/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Samuel A. Forman in support of #97 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byAir & Liquid Systems Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2 In Support of Forman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 3-4 In Support of Forman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 5 In Support of Forman Declaration, #4 Exhibit 6, Part 1 in Support of Forman Declaration, #5 Exhibit 6, Part 2 in Support of Forman Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6, Part 3 in Support of Forman Declaration, #7 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Exhibit 6, Part 4 In Support of Forman Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7-8 In Support of Forman Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9-10 In Support of Forman Declaration, #10 Exhibit 11-12 In Support of Forman Declaration, #11 Exhibit 13-14 In Support of Forman Declaration, #12 Exhibit 15-17 In Support of Forman Declaration)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Scadden, James) (Filed on 2/12/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Filing 100 Declaration of ROGER B. HORNE, JR., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND filed byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 99 Proposed Order DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 98 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #72 Amended MOTION to Remand ) DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND filed byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 97 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #72 Amended MOTION to Remand ) filed byAir & Liquid Systems Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rear Admiral David Sargent, #2 Exhibit A1-D in Support of Sargent Declaration, #3 Exhibit E-G1 in Support of Sargent Declaration, #4 Exhibit H in Support of Sargent Declaration, #5 Exhibit I-K3 in Support of Sargent Declaration, #6 Exhibit L-N in Support of Sargent Declaration, #7 Exhibit O-Q in Support of Sargent Declaration, #8 Exhibit R-T in Support of Sargent Declaration, #9 Exhibit U1-U2 in Support of Sargent Declaration, #10 Exhibit V in Support of Sargent Declaration)(Scadden, James) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Counsel are reminded that all futures filings shall bear the initials MMC immediately after the case number. See #20 Order Reassigning Case. Re : #91 Notice (Other) filed by Johnson Controls Inc, #95 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Goulds Pumps LLC, #86 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Tyco International plc, #89 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Goulds Pumps LLC, #88 Notice of Appearance filed by Goulds Pumps LLC, #94 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Johnson Controls Inc, #85 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Tyco International plc, #83 Notice (Other) filed by Tyco International plc, #84 Notice of Appearance filed by Tyco International plc, #92 Notice of Appearance filed by Johnson Controls Inc, #87 Notice (Other) filed by Goulds Pumps LLC, #90 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Grinnell LLC, #93 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Johnson Controls Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. The docket text and filer's name have been modified. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #90 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Grinnell LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2019 Filing 95 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goulds Pumps LLC re #87 Notice (Other), #89 Certificate of Interested Entities, #88 Notice of Appearance GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 94 Certificate of Interested Entities by Johnson Controls Inc DEFENDANT JOHNSON CONTROLS INC.'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls Inc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc, a publicly-traded company listed on the NYSE for Johnson Controls Inc. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES OF DEFENDANT JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE by Johnson Controls Inc DEFENDANT JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 90 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Grinnell LLC. (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019) Modified on 2/7/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2019 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps LLC identifying Other Affiliate ITT INC. for Goulds Pumps LLC. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES OF DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR GOULDS PUMPS LLC (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE by Goulds Pumps LLC DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 86 Certificate of Interested Entities by Grinnell LLC DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC identifying Other Affiliate TYCO INTERNATIONAL plc for Grinnell LLC. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES OF DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR GRINNELL LLC (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE by Grinnell LLC DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ANSWER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 81 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN, CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. filed by Debbie L. Viale. (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Counsel are reminded that all future filings shall bear the initials MMC immediately after the case number. See #20 Order Reassigning Case. Re: #74 Notice of Appearance filed by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., #73 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #72 Amended MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2019 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metalclad Insulation Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Transport Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ENTRX LLC (Holding Company), Other Affiliate Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate), Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group) for Metalclad Insulation Corporation. This Certificate Of Interested Parties is filed on behalf of Metalclad Insulation LLC erroneously sued herein as Metalclad Insulation Corporation. (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Christian Jackson , Lisa L. Oberg and Kathy M. Huynh on behalf of Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC erroneously sued herein as Metalclad Insulation Corporation (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by Certainteed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France for Certainteed Corporation. (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Christian Jackson , Lisa L. Oberg and Kathy M. Huynh on behalf of Defendant CertainTeed Corporation (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 76 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Calaveras Asbestos Ltd.. (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 75 Renotice motion hearing re #72 Amended MOTION to Remand filed byDebbie L. Viale. (Related document(s) #72 ) (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Estrada (Estrada, Michael) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 73 Notice Filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) bySPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.. (Estrada, Michael) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #72 Amended MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2019 Filing 72 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Debbie L. Viale. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/19 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 2/12/2019. Replies due by 2/19/2019. (Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 1/29/2019) Modified on 1/30/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2019 Filing 71 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #72 *** MOTION to Remand filed by Debbie L. Viale. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 2/12/2019. Replies due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belantis, Nectaria) (Filed on 1/29/2019) Modified on 1/30/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 70 Statement of Corporate Disclosure and Certification of Interested Parties on behalf of Defendant Calaveras Natural Resources, Inc. erroneously sued as Calaveras by Calaveras Natural Resources Inc. (McCormick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 69 ANSWER of Defendant Calaveras Natural Resources, Inc., to Plaintiffs' Amended Compaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Actions and Request for Jury Trial - Asbestos ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byCalaveras Natural Resources Inc. (McCormick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M McCormick on behalf of Defendant Calaveras Natural Resources, Inc. erroneously sued as Calaveras Natural Resources, Inc. (Sued individually and as Successor-in-interest to and alter ego to CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD) (McCormick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 67 Statement of Corporate Disclosure and Certification of Interested Parties by Calaveras Asbestos Ltd. (McCormick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER of Defendant Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd.'s to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival actions and Request for Jury Trial - Asbesto ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byCalaveras Asbestos Ltd. (McCormick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M McCormick on behalf of Defendant Calaveras Asbestos, Ltd. (McCormick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Counsel are reminded that all future filings shall bear the initials MMC immediately after the case number. See #20 Order Reassigning Case. Re: #61 Notice of Appearance filed by Trane USA, #60 Notice of Appearance filed by Union Oil Company, #62 Notice of Appearance filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF SPECIFIED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance for Chevron U.S.A. Inc. by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 1/22/2019) Modified on 1/23/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance for Trans USA by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 1/22/2019) Modified on 1/23/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance for Union Oil Company of California by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 1/22/2019) Modified on 1/23/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation of Adoption of Previously Filed State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Actions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McClain, Florence) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 58 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Union Carbide Corporation.. (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Florence Anne McClain (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 53 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., Corporate Parent CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Corporate Parent NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. re #52 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 52 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury by CBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 1/17/2019) Modified on 1/18/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by Exxonmobile Corporation of Filing State Court Answer (Ogdie, Susan) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by Exxonmobile Corporation (Ogdie, Susan) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Ogdie (Ogdie, Susan) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elementis Chemicals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Elementis Global LLC, Corporate Parent Elementis US Limited, Corporate Parent Elementis US Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Elementis US Investments Ltd., Corporate Parent Elementis plc for Elementis Chemicals Inc. (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety adding Corporate Parents (or Other Affiliates) when prompted to do so on the screen. Re: #47 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Elementis Chemicals Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2019 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elementis Chemicals Inc (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Denise Fitzpatrick (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGeneral Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo for Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner for Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon for Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson for Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Packing & Supply Per FRCP 26(a) (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 37 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by A.W. Chesterton Company.. (Jenkins, Stephen) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Debbie L. Viale.. (Paul, Joshua) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation, Corporate Parent Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc. for Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byChevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Trane USA identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Trane USA. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byTrane USA. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation, Corporate Parent Unocal Corporation for Union Oil Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byUnion Oil Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2019.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anheuser-Busch, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide Inc for Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Defendant Anheuser-Busch, LLC's (Erroneously Sued as Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide Inc.) Amended Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons) (Kim, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 27 Answer to Amended Complaint (Defendant Anheuser-Busch, LLC's (Erroneously Sued as Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide Inc.) Amended Answer to Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Actions - Asbestos; Demand for Jury Trial) byAnheuser-Busch, LLC. (Kim, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sterling Fluid Systems USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Grundfos Holding AG for Sterling Fluid Systems USA LLC. (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 25 Answer to Amended Complaint ; Demand for Jury Trial bySterling Fluid Systems USA LLC. (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa Kacy Gittler (Gittler, Marissa) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Carter Pieper (Pieper, Timothy) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anheuser-Busch, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide Inc for Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Defendant Anheuser-Busch, LLC's Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons) (Kim, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 21 Answer to Amended Complaint (Defendant Anheuser-Busch, LLC's Answer to Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Actions - Asbestos; Demand for Jury Trial) byAnheuser-Busch, LLC. (Kim, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Air & Liquid Systems Corp (Scadden, James) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 17 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, by Air & Liquid Systems Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Joinder, #2 Exhibit 2 Joinder, #3 Exhibit A-C to Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit D-E to Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit F to Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit G to Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit H-I to Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3 to Joinder, #9 Exhibit 4 to Joinder, #10 Exhibit 5 to Joinder, #11 Exhibit 6 to Joinder, #12 Exhibit 7 to Joinder, #13 Exhibit 8 to Joinder)(Scadden, James) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by A.W. Chesterton Company (Jenkins, Stephen) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lindsay Jenkins (Jenkins, Stephen) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 Answer to Amended Complaint byA.W. Chesterton Company. (Jenkins, Stephen) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to Amended Complaint FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL ACTIONS ASBESTOS byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Park, Charles) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent AMEC Foster Wheeler USA Corporation for Foster Wheeler LLC. DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER (Park, Charles) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AMEC Foster Wheeler USA Corporation.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint for Damages by Allied Fluid Prodcuts Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/7/2019) Modified on 1/8/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allied Fluid Prodcuts Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allied Fluid Prodcuts Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc... (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Thomas Cordery on behalf of Allied Fluid Products Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply Inc. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/7/2019) Modified on 1/8/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/18/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 44611016004. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT from Alameda Superior Court California. Their case number is RG18927446. Filed by AMEC Foster Wheeler USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 1/3/2019) Modified on 1/8/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viale et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementis Chemicals Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Denise Fitzpatrick
Represented By: William H. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corp
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenan Properties Inc.
Represented By: W. Joseph Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qunitec Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calaveras Asbestos Ltd
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Jennifer M McCormick
Represented By: Gary David Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxonmobile Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Denise Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Susan A. Ogdie
Represented By: William H. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane USA
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMEC Foster Wheeler USA Corporation
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Packing & Supply
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Stephen Lindsay Jenkins
Represented By: Anthony Sinclair Miller
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems USA LLC
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Timothy Carter Pieper
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Marissa Kacy Gittler
Represented By: Eric Dean Sentlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Michelle Christian Jackson
Represented By: Kathy Mai Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Michelle Christian Jackson
Represented By: Kathy Mai Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calaveras Natural Resources Inc
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Jennifer M McCormick
Represented By: Gary David Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch, LLC
Represented By: Cristyn Nicole Chadwick
Represented By: Nell Gibson Moley
Represented By: Robert D. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Casey Mathews
Represented By: Michael E Flynn-O'Brien
Represented By: Erika Aspericueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide Inc
Represented By: Cristyn Nicole Chadwick
Represented By: Nell Gibson Moley
Represented By: Robert D. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Aaron Michael Brian
Represented By: Ross Morton Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Company
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Florence Anne McClain
Represented By: Deborah Ann Smith
Represented By: Gina Ann Haran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe Braun, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Marisa Renee Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie L. Viale
Represented By: Nectaria Belantis
Represented By: Bryon Josselyn
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Paul
Represented By: Peter Christopher Beirne,
Represented By: Bryon Paxson Josselyn,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Jacobs
Represented By: Nectaria Belantis
Represented By: Bryon Josselyn
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Paul
Represented By: Peter Christopher Beirne,
Represented By: Bryon Paxson Josselyn,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?