Brittain,et al v. Twitter Incorporated

Plaintiff: Brittain For US Senate and Craig R Brittain
Defendant: Twitter Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00114
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 48 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 47 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the District of Arizona (Phoenix Division); Case Number 2:18-cv-01714-DGC. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received. Modified on 1/9/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order 46 ORDER: Defendant's motion to transfer venue (Doc. #22 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' motion to compel (Doc. #27 ) is denied. The clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/4/2019. (EJA)
December 21, 2018 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #44 MOTION to Strike #39 Reply to Response to Motion, #40 Objection, #41 Declaration MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
December 10, 2018 44 SUR-REPLY to #39 Reply to Response to Motion, RESPONSE to #40 Objection, RESPONSE to #41 Declaration, MOTION to Strike, MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Craig R Brittain. (EJA)
December 10, 2018 43 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Twitter Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) *Modified to correct event type on 12/11/2018 (EJA).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 42 ORDER granting #34 Defendant's motion to extend. Plaintiff's motion for contempt (Doc. #38 ) is denied. The Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for December 13, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. is vacated. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/7/18. (EJA)
December 6, 2018 41 DECLARATION of Ryan T. Mrazik in Support of Objection to Case Management Report by Defendant Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
December 6, 2018 40 OBJECTION re: #37 Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP by Defendant Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
December 5, 2018 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #34 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, Extend Deadlines for Answer and Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Responses MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
December 3, 2018 38 MOTION for Contempt by Craig R Brittain. (EJA)
December 3, 2018 37 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Craig R Brittain. (EJA)
December 3, 2018 36 RESPONSE to Motion re: #34 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Extend Deadlines for Answer and Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Responses filed by Craig R Brittain. (EJA)
November 30, 2018 35 DECLARATION of Ryan T. Mrazik re: #34 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, Extend Deadlines for Answer and Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Responses by Defendant Twitter Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
November 30, 2018 34 *MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Extend Deadlines for Answer and Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Responses by Twitter Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques). *Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 12/3/2018 (EJA).
November 26, 2018 33 Sur-Reply to #30 Reply to Response to Motion, and REPLY to Response to Motion re: #27 MOTION to Compel filed by Brittain For US Senate. (EJA)
November 13, 2018 32 SUPPLEMENT re: #27 Response to Motion, REPLY to Response to Motion re: #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Craig R Brittain. (DXD)
November 13, 2018 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Compel filed by Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
November 13, 2018 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #22 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case filed by Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
November 8, 2018 29 DECLARATION of Ryan Mrazik re: #28 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Twitter Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
November 8, 2018 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
November 5, 2018 27 RESPONSE to Motion re: #22 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer Case and MOTION to Compel (Request for Hearing) by Craig R Brittain. (ATD)
November 5, 2018 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #21 Notice of Appearance, #22 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case, #23 Declaration, #24 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #25 Additional Attachments to Main Document filed by Twitter Incorporated. Documents are not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ATD)
November 5, 2018 25 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #22 MOTION to Change Venue/ Transfer Case by Defendant Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) *Modified text on 11/5/2018 (ATD).
November 2, 2018 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
November 2, 2018 23 *DECLARATION of Courtney Smith re: #22 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case by Defendant Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) *Modified text on 11/5/2018 (ATD).
November 2, 2018 22 *MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case by Twitter Incorporated. (Associated Cases: CV-18-01714-PHX-DGC) (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) *Modified on 11/5/2018 to correct motion type (ATD).
November 2, 2018 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean-Jacques Cabou on behalf of Twitter Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for December 13, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 603, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. (See document for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/26/18. (SLQ)
October 23, 2018 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Craig R Brittain, Brittain For US Senate: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/10/18 to Twitter Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons)(SLQ)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 18 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #16 Motion to for Change of Judge. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/5/18. (MSA)
October 4, 2018 Summons Issued as to Twitter Incorporated at counter to plaintiff. (BAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for expedited service/personal or third party process of service and motion for reconsideration #15 is denied. The deadline for Plaintiff to properly serve his summons, amended complaint, notice to the parties regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot, and motion for preliminary injunction, on Defendant is extended to November 27, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/27/2018. (REK)
September 10, 2018 16 MOTION to Reassign Case (Titled: Motion for Change of Judge) by Craig R Brittain, Brittain For US Senate. (REK)
August 31, 2018 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #12 Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing, MOTION for Expedited Service/Personal or Third Party Process of Service by Craig R Brittain, Brittain For US Senate. (REK)
July 27, 2018 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Craig R Brittain. (DXD)
June 26, 2018 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Twitter Incorporated filed by Craig R Brittain, Brittain For US Senate.(SLQ)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER -Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is granted. Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing is denied. Plaintiff shall have until July 11, 2018, to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by that date, the Court will instruct the clerk to dismiss this case and close the file. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/22/18. (MSA)
June 20, 2018 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-1714-PHX-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 19, 2018 11 *NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP)/Mandatory Initial Discovery Process filed by Plaintiff (MSA) *Modified on 6/25/2018 to correct event; NEF regenerated (MSA)(CEI).
June 19, 2018 10 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Craig R Brittain, Brittain For US Senate. (MSA)
June 19, 2018 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 6, 2018 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (HLA)
June 6, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (HLA)
June 5, 2018 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-1714-PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form Instructions)(HLA)
June 5, 2018 3 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Craig R Brittain. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (HLA)
June 5, 2018 2 APPLICATION To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees Or Costs (Long Form) by Craig R Brittain. (HLA)
June 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Craig R Brittain, Brittain For US Senate.(HLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittain,et al v. Twitter Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter Incorporated
Represented By: Jean-Jacques Cabou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittain For US Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig R Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?