Aycox v. Global Glimpse

Plaintiff: Morgan Aycox
Defendant: Global Glimpse
Case Number: 3:2019cv00174
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/24/2019 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to re view General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-09109. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 8, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California (jca)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the parties, that: 1. Plaintiff agrees to withdraw her claims under the SHRL and CHRL; 2. The parties agree to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California; 3. Plaintiff reserves her right to amend the complaint following transfer to assert any available claims under California State Law that could have been brought had this matter originated in the United States District Court for the Northern District of California; and 4. Defendant reserves any and all rights and objections with respect to any amendment sought by Plaintiff following transfer to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that this stipulation may be executed in counterparts, each of which shall be deemed an original and all of which shall constitute one and the same document. Facsimile or electronic copies shall be deemed the same as originals. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/8/2019) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re: #13 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.SECOND MOTION to Transfer Case TRANSFER VENUE PURSUAUNT TO 42 U.S.C. 2000E-5(f)(3), 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) AND 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). . Document filed by Morgan Aycox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation)(Vinci, Gabrielle)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue served on Megan S. Goddard Esq. and Gabrielle M. Vinci, Esq. on December 11, 2018 and December 13, 2018. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by Global Glimpse. (Spitz, Alice)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER:On November 5, 2018, defendant filed a motion to dismiss the original complaint in this action pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed. R. Civ. P., and to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and 1406. An Order of November 5 directed the plaintiff to file any amended complaint by November 30 and alerted the plaintiff that it would likely not have another opportunity to amend. The plaintiff filed an amended complaint on November 30, thereby mooting the defendants November 5 motion. Defendants renewed their motion on December 11. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by January 4, 2019. Defendants reply, if any, shall be served by January 11, 2019...... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/12/2018) (gr)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint., SECOND MOTION to Transfer Case TRANSFER VENUE PURSUAUNT TO 42 U.S.C. 2000E-5(f)(3), 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) AND 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Document filed by Global Glimpse. Return Date set for 12/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation in Support of Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #3 Affidavit Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Transfer Venue, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Eliza Pesuit in Support Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Transfer Venue)(Spitz, Alice)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: On November 5, 2018, the defendant moved to dismiss the plaintiffs complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed. R. Civ. P., and to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and 1406. On November 30, 2018, the plaintiff filed an amended complaint. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants November 5 motion to dismiss and to transfer shall be terminated as moot. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/30/2018) (gr)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Global Glimpse with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Morgan Aycox. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Vinci, Gabrielle)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by November 30, 2018. It is unlikely that plaintiff will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss and to transfer by November 30, 2018. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by December 7, 2018. At the time any reply is filed, the moving party shall supply Chambers with two (2) courtesy copies of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2018.), Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #8 FIRST MOTION to Change Venue TRANSFER VENUE PURSUAUNT TO 42 U.S.C. 2000E-5(f)(3), 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) AND 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case TRANSFER VENUE PURSUAUNT TO 42 U.S.C. 2000E-5(f)(3), 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) AND 28 U.S.C. 1406(a).FIRST MOTION to Dismiss DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) (Responses due by 11/30/2018, Replies due by 12/7/2018.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet, Part 1on 11/5/2018) (rro)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue served on Megan S. Goddard Esq. and Gabrielle M. Vinci, Esq. on November 5, 2018. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by Global Glimpse. (Spitz, Alice)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Change Venue TRANSFER VENUE PURSUAUNT TO 42 U.S.C. 2000E-5(f)(3), 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) AND 28 U.S.C. 1406(a)., FIRST MOTION to Transfer Case TRANSFER VENUE PURSUAUNT TO 42 U.S.C. 2000E-5(f)(3), 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) AND 28 U.S.C. 1406(a).( Return Date set for 11/19/2018 at 09:00 AM.), FIRST MOTION to Dismiss DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6).( Return Date set for 11/19/2018 at 09:00 AM.) Document filed by Global Glimpse. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Affidavit Memorandum of Law, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Eliza Pesuit)(Spitz, Alice) Modified on 12/20/2018 (db).
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Global Glimpse served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. Service was accepted by Evette Beasley. Document filed by Morgan Aycox. (Vinci, Gabrielle)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Global Glimpse. (dnh)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Global Glimpse, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Morgan Aycox. (Vinci, Gabrielle)
October 5, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Megan Sarah Goddard to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested was not entered in the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
October 5, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Megan Sarah Goddard. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:451; County code Albany. The following corrections have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1981; the County code has been modified to New York. (pne)
October 5, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
October 5, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
October 5, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabrielle Vinci on behalf of Morgan Aycox. (Vinci, Gabrielle)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Goddard, Megan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Morgan Aycox. (Goddard, Megan) Modified on 10/5/2018 (pne).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Global Glimpse. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15659765)Document filed by Morgan Aycox.(Goddard, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aycox v. Global Glimpse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Glimpse
Represented By: Alice Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Aycox
Represented By: Megan Sarah Goddard
Represented By: Gabrielle Vinci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?