San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al

Plaintiff: Los Padres Forestwatch and San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior, Bureau of Reclamation and Brenda Burman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00177
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Stipulated Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 3/19/19; reply due 4/5/19; hearing set for 5/2/2019 at 1:30 p.m. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper. (Cooper, Daniel) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, U.S. Department of the Interior. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 3/12/2019. Replies due by 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael P. Jackson, #2 Declaration of James A. Scharf)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Morgan Hall (Hall, Margaret) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Edward M. Chen. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Judge. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper.. (Cooper, Daniel) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, U.S. Department of the Interior.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 01/22/19. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To The Complaint filed by Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, U.S. Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bureau of Reclamation, Brenda Burman, U.S. Department of the Interior (Scharf, James) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 17CV01852. (). Filed byBureau of Reclamation, U.S. Department of the Interior, Brenda Burman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 1/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Padres Forestwatch
Represented By: Linda J. Krop
Represented By: Margaret Morgan Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper
Represented By: Daniel Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Stephen Macfarlane
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Stephen Macfarlane
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Burman
Represented By: Stephen Macfarlane
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?