Duar v. Delta Airlines Corp.
Plaintiff: Emad Duar
Defendant: Delta Airlines Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00209
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Delta Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/11/2019 0at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 ADR Scheduling Order) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/13/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 13, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 Letter dated 1/25/2019 from Emad Duar. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2019: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope) (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Emad Duar re #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Emad Duar.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/31/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Emad Duar. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/7/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Delta Airlines Corp... (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Form Complaint and Declaration byDelta Airlines Corp.. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is 18-859558, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12996206). Filed by Delta Airlines Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Certification of Interested Persons or Entities)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 1/11/2019) Modified on 1/14/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duar v. Delta Airlines Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines Corp.
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emad Duar
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?