American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada

Plaintiff: American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada and Musicians Union Local 6
Defendant: Eliot Kenin, James Milstead, Henry Lee Oden, Joseph Sosensky, Michael Sasaki and Michael Gwinn Harryman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00308
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
0 Judge: James Donato
1 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/18/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING CALL: This case was referred for a settlement conference to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court sets a call with the parties to discuss the timing and logistics of the settlement conference for Thursday, 3/28/2019 at 11:00 AM. The court will email a call-in number separately. If this date does not work, parties may request to change the date by stipulation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 29 OBJECTIONS to re #24 Notice of Appearance Request for Early Settlement Conference by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada, Musicians Union Local 6. (Garner, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Gwinn Harryman re #25 Notice (Other), of Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and Declaration of Clement L. Glynn in Support of Notice of Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint (Glynn, Clement) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 27 Letter dated 3/11/19 from Eliot Kenin. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada re #24 Notice of Appearance (Garner, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Michael Gwinn Harryman OF STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Clement L. Glynn in Support of Notice of Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Glynn, Clement) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Clement L. Glynn and Request for Early Settlement Conference (Glynn, Clement) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada re #21 Amended Complaint (Garner, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAmerican Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada, Musicians Union Local 6. (Garner, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/8/2019 before Judge James Donato by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Garner, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 23 Letter dated James Milstead. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge James Donato granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Garner.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada re #9 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings of Time Change of Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Naymark, Russell) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/8/2019 08:45 AM. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. to Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/8/2019 at 8:45 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 Receipt in the amount $5,000.00 from AFM General Fund, receipt date 02/01/19, receipt #34611140085. (palsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada re #9 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings of Michael Sasaki (Naymark, Russell) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada re #9 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings of Henry Lee Oden (Naymark, Russell) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada re #9 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings of Eliot Kenin (Naymark, Russell) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/30/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada of Complaint, TRO Application Papers, and TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Delivery Confirmation, #2 Exhibit Joseph Sosensky Email, #3 Exhibit FedEx Shipment Details)(Naymark, Russell) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/25/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2019 01:30 PM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada (Naymark, Russell) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13016002.) filed by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificates)(Naymark, Russell) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, Ex Parte Application filed by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Beth Zare, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jay Blumenthal, #3 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer P. Garner, #4 Declaration Declaration of Kenneth Shirk, #5 Declaration Declaration of Raymond M. Hair, #6 Declaration Declaration of Wally Malone, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application)(Naymark, Russell) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAmerican Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Naymark, Russell) (Filed on 1/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliot Kenin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Milstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Lee Oden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Sosensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gwinn Harryman
Represented By: Clement L. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada
Represented By: Russell Inerfield Naymark
Represented By: Jennifer Patrice Garner, Garne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Musicians Union Local 6
Represented By: Russell Inerfield Naymark
Represented By: Jennifer Patrice Garner, Garne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?