Liaw v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Theodore Liaw
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00396
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gaw, Randolph) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing re #19 Order: Motion Hearing re #13 MOTION to Strike is VACATED. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 4/4/2019 8:00 AM is rescheduled to 4/4/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Airlines, Inc.. Filed by Theodore Liaw. (Gaw, Randolph) (Filed on 3/12/2019) Modified on 3/13/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING #13 MOTION TO STRIKE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/12/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, ) filed by Theodore Liaw. (Gaw, Randolph) (Filed on 3/11/2019) Modified on 3/11/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING CMC: Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 4/25/2019 11:00 AM is rescheduled to 4/4/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Continental Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc.. (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Continental Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc.. (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Order re #13 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by United Airlines, Inc.. (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, filed by United Airlines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 3/11/2019. Replies due by 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard A. Lazenby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge Alsup. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Theodore Liaw re #5 Summons Issued (Gaw, Randolph) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Airlines, Inc... (Lazenby, Richard) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
January 26, 2019 Filing 7 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Theodore Liaw. (Gaw, Randolph) (Filed on 1/26/2019)
January 26, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Theodore Liaw.. (Gaw, Randolph) (Filed on 1/26/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/6/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gaw, Randolph) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Defendant United Airlines, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13024910). Filed by Theodore Liaw. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaw, Randolph) (Filed on 1/23/2019) Modified on 1/25/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liaw v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Anthony Lazenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Liaw
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Represented By: Flora F. Vigo
Represented By: Mark Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?