District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. A & B Painting, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen and Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: A & B Painting, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00405
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #20 Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 is vacated and rescheduled for 12/19/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; Proposed Order Thereon filed by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo. (Shuldiner, Allan) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #18 Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 is vacated and rescheduled for 10/17/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; Proposed Order Thereon filed by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, John Maggiore. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint byA & B Painting, Inc.. (Hill, Richard) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by A & B Painting, Inc. (Hill, Richard) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #14 Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 is vacated and rescheduled for 7/11/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 5/2/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Maggiore, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Jeannie Simpelo, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen. Service waived by A & B Painting, Inc. waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
February 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/15/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo.. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to A & B Painting, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/6/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A & B Painting, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13027403.). Filed byJohn Maggiore, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Jeannie Simpelo, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 1/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. A & B Painting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Allan Darren Shuldiner
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Simpelo
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Allan Darren Shuldiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Allan Darren Shuldiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Allan Darren Shuldiner
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Allan Darren Shuldiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Allan Darren Shuldiner
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christophersen
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Allan Darren Shuldiner
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Allan Darren Shuldiner
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & B Painting, Inc.
Represented By: Richard N. Hill
Represented By: Adam Bouka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?