District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. C & A Flooring, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, Chris Christophersen and John Sherak
Defendant: C & A Flooring, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00408
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, John Sherak, Jeannie Simpelo.. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to C & A Flooring, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/6/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, John Sherak, Jeannie Simpelo (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C & A Flooring, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13028259.). Filed byJohn Maggiore, Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, Jeannie Simpelo, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, John Sherak, Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 1/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. C & A Flooring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Simpelo
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Coast Counties Floor Covering Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christophersen
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sherak
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & A Flooring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?