District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen and Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Richard Giaramita and J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00631
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Default REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.; DECLARATION OF TINO X. DO IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting #19 Motion to Continue. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER filed by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/10/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #17 Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON: filed by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #15 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/30/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON: filed by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: This matter is currently set for a Case Management Conference on 7/15/2019 at 1:30 PM. The Court has not yet received a Case Management Statement from the parties which was due yesterday 7/8/2019. The parties are directed to submit a Case Management Statement as soon as possible. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #12 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/15/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Chambers. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON: filed by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, John Maggiore. J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL: (Do, Tino) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendant Richard Giaramita. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo.. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/20/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, John Maggiore, Jeannie Simpelo re #2 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint,, (Do, Tino) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Giaramita, J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13066829.). Filed by Jeannie Simpelo, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma, John Maggiore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Do, Tino) (Filed on 2/5/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Simpelo
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Board of Trustees of District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and District Council 16 Northern California Journeyma
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christophersen
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Giaramita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?