ABM Aviation, Inc. v. Teamsters Local 665

Petitioner: ABM Aviation, Inc.
Respondent: Teamsters Local 665
Case Number: 3:2019cv00707
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ABM Aviation, Inc. (Ross, Alan) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING re #5 Stipulation To Extend Time To Respond to Petition filed by Teamsters Local 665. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/27/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, filed by Teamsters Local 665. (Sexton, Sheila) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by ABM Aviation, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate FSP PPM Management, LLC for ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Ross, Alan) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Vacate Arbitration Award against Teamsters Local 665 (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13077405). Filed by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ross, Alan) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/14/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABM Aviation, Inc. v. Teamsters Local 665
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Teamsters Local 665
Represented By: Sheila Kathleen Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ABM Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Geoffrey Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?