Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California et al v. BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Heavy and Highway Committee, Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Trust Fund and Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Defendant: BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc., James Slender, Brad Slender and BCJ Sand
Case Number: 3:2019cv00710
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Russell E. Burns, Heavy and Highway Committee, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Trust Fund James Slender aka Brad Slender (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Russell E. Burns, Heavy and Highway Committee, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Trust Fund BCJ Sand and Rock, Inc. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Defendant James Slender shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 4/1/2019 a copy of this notice was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Defendant James Slender shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/21/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 3/7/2019 a copy of this notice was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc... (Griffith, David) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint; by BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc. (Griffith, David) (Filed on 3/5/2019) Modified on 3/6/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint; byJames Slender. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2019: #1 Letter dated 02/26/19, #2 Envelope) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Russell E. Burns, Heavy and Highway Committee, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Trust Fund.. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc., James Slender. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Russell E. Burns, James E. Murray All Parties must be identified on the Proposed Summons for Issuance (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/8/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Russell E. Burns, Heavy and Highway Committee, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Trust Fund (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE ERROR MESSAGE DATED 02/08/19 Proposed Summons. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc., James Slender ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13077932.). Filed byOperating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Russell E. Burns, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 2/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California et al v. BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc.
Represented By: David Richard Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Slender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Slender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCJ Sand
Represented By: David Richard Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Murray
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?