Free Speech Systems LLC v. Menzel

Plaintiff: Free Speech Systems LLC
Defendant: Peter Menzel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00711
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
0 Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
1 Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/08/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Free Speech Systems LLC, Free Speech Systems LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/15/2019. Replies due by 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Alex) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Free Speech Systems LLC, Free Speech Systems LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/15/2019. Replies due by 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Alex) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 ERRATA re #15 Answer to to CounterClaim, by Free Speech Systems LLC, Free Speech Systems LLC. (Shepard, Alex) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #16 ERRATA ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byFree Speech Systems LLC, Free Speech Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Shepard, Alex) (Filed on 4/1/2019) Modified on 4/2/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Menzel.. (Gomes, Justin) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/27/2019. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Free Speech Systems LLC identifying Other Affiliate Alex Jones for Free Speech Systems LLC. (Shepard, Alex) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Peter Menzel (Burroughs, Scott) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Free Speech Systems LLC byPeter Menzel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burroughs, Scott) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Peter Menzel. (Burroughs, Scott) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Free Speech Systems LLC. Peter Menzel served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Shepard, Alex) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Free Speech Systems LLC.. (Shepard, Alex) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Peter Menzel. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2019. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter Menzel ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13078111.). Filed byFree Speech Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Shepard, Alex) (Filed on 2/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Free Speech Systems LLC v. Menzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Free Speech Systems LLC
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Represented By: Alex James Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Menzel
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?