Manier v. Sims Metal Management-Northwest

Plaintiff: RIcky Manier, Jr.
Defendant: Sims Metal Management-Northwest
Case Number: 3:2019cv00718
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sims Metal Management-Northwest of Initiating Documents from Northern District Court (Glatzer, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District, #3 Standing Order for Certain Employment Cases) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement d ue by 5/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sims Metal Management-Northwest.. (Glatzer, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judg e filed by Sims Metal Management-Northwest Court takes notice of the comment on the left hand corner of the form, however, counsel must complete the form in its entirety and re-file. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sims Metal Management-Northwest.. (Glatzer, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sims Metal Management-Northwest Re Civil Standing Order (Glatzer, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sims Metal Management-Northwest and Filing of Notice to Plaintiff and Clerk of the Contra Costa Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court (Glatzer, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 -Exhibit B) by Sims Metal Management-Northwest. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Sims Metal Management-Northwest . (Glatzer, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of No Related Cases by Sims Metal Management-Northwest (Glatzer, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sims Metal Management-Northwest identifying Corporate Parent Sims Group USA Corporation for Sims Metal Management-Northwest. (Glatzer, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C19-00011. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13078836). Filed by Sims Metal Management-Northwest. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Glatzer, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manier v. Sims Metal Management-Northwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIcky Manier, Jr.
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Represented By: Edward Wonkyu Choi
Represented By: Dennis Sangwon Hyun
Represented By: Larry W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sims Metal Management-Northwest
Represented By: Bonnie A. Glatzer
Represented By: Alicia Cabeceira Anderson
Represented By: Maritza Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?