Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.208.9.165

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.208.9.165
Case Number: 3:2019cv00723
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 ERRATA re #9 Notice (Other), RE Notice Providing Clarification Regarding The Registration Status of Plaintiff's Copyright Applications by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero to File Updated Exhibit Regarding Copyright Registration Status #9 . (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019).
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #8 Ex Parte Application. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #8 Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof Providing Clarification Regarding The Registration Status of Plaintiff's Copyright Applications (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement - Demand For Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.208.9.165 (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13079187.). Filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.208.9.165
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.208.9.165
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?