Lara v. Nielsen et al
Petitioner: Walter Osbaldo Molina Lara
Respondent: L. Francis Cissna, John Kramar, Kirstjen Nielsen and Lee Francis Cissna
Case Number: 3:2019cv00751
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Without Prejudice, Due to USCIS Scheduling of Oath Ceremony) by Walter Osbaldo Molina Lara (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lee Francis Cissna, John Kramar, Kirstjen Nielsen. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/26/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Walter Osbaldo Molina Lara.. (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Naturalization against Lee Francis Cissna, John Kramar, Kirstjen Nielsen (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13083583). Filed by Walter Osbaldo Molina Lara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Evidentiary Records (N-400 Application and Supplements before USCIS), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crabtree, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lara v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Kramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lee Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walter Osbaldo Molina Lara
Represented By: Kevin Michael Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?