Schneider, et al v. Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Schneider, et al
Defendant: FCA U.S., LLC, Sergio Marchionne, Robert Bosch LLC, VM North America, Inc., VM Motori S.p.A., Robert Bosch GmbH and Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00788
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of filing of new MDL related action. Please refer to case no. 3:17-cv-2777 for all previously filed Pretrial Orders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10231. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of California for MDL 2777 (SSch)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) to Northern District of California for MDL # 2777. (SSch)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) for MDL # 2777. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
January 24, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bryan Schneider, et al against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7077787 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Adams - County Where Action Arose: Adams - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC, 18-cv-13838, Judge David M. Lawson] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet, #2 Summons for Issue, #3 Summons for Issue, #4 Summons for Issue, #5 Summons for Issue, #6 Summons for Issue, #7 Summons for Issue, #8 Summons for Issue) (Stern, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider, et al v. Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Schneider, et al
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA U.S., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Marchionne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VM North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VM Motori S.p.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?