McIntosh v. Thomaz
Plaintiff: Kaleb McIntosh
Defendant: Cameron Jibril Thomaz
Case Number: 3:2019cv00800
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Cameron Jibril Thomaz. Filed by Kaleb McIntosh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons by Kaleb McIntosh. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaleb McIntosh.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kaleb McIntosh. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Cameron Jibril Thomaz (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Kaleb McIntosh. Consent/Declination due by 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntosh v. Thomaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Jibril Thomaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleb McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?