Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.130.3.240

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.130.3.240
Case Number: 3:2019cv00859
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 7/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Case Management Statement is now due by 6/25/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f)CONFERENCE AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/14/2019.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 ERRATA re #10 Notice (Other), RE Notice Providing Clarification Regarding The Registration Status of Plaintiff's Copyright Applications by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE UPDATED EXHIBIT A WITH DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 11, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #9 Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof Providing Clarification Regarding The Registration Status of Plaintiff's Copyright Applications (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/22/2019. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 6/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Case Management Statement is now due by 6/11/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/19/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT-DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; (NO PROCESS); against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.130.3.240 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13099225.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 2/15/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.130.3.240
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.130.3.240
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?