Pircher v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Sylvie Pircher
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00869
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Receipt from Eastern District of California. The case number is 19-604. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO TRANSFER. In light of the parties' joint stipulation, Dkt. No. #14 , the case is transferred to the Eastern District of California. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The initial case management conference set for May 23, 2019, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/5/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019) Modified on 4/5/2019 (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/7/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019) Modified on 3/6/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Mutual of Omaha for United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Swick, Jodi) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.. (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sylvie Pircher.. (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sylvie Pircher Plaintiff (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Noah, Paul) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13100454.). Filed bySylvie Pircher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noah, Paul) (Filed on 2/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pircher v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvie Pircher
Represented By: Paul Randall Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Charan M. Higbee
Represented By: Jodi Krystyn Swick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?