Sandoz Inc. v. Amgen Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Defendant: Amgen Manufacturing, Limited and Amgen Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00977
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandoz Inc.. Amgen Manufacturing, Limited served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. (See Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond) (Pai, Eric) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer H. Wu. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Eric A. Stone. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nicholas P. Groombridge. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (Wang, Sue) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13180695.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/18/2019 filed by Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (Wu, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13180660.) filed by Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (Stone, Eric) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13180629.) filed by Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (Groombridge, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Wang (Wang, Sue) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited identifying Corporate Parent Amgen Inc. for Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (Winters, Vernon) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Vernon Michael Winters (Winters, Vernon) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandoz Inc.. Amgen Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Pai, Eric) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RELATING CASES 14-cv-04741 RS and 19-cv-00977 VKD. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/6/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing, Limited. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/7/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sandoz Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Sandoz Inc.. re #1 Complaint, (Olson, Erik) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Olson, Erik) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF PATENT NONINFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13111384.). Filed bySandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Erik) (Filed on 2/21/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoz Inc. v. Amgen Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Eric Chingyun Pai
Represented By: Erik J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Manufacturing, Limited
Represented By: Sue Wang
Represented By: Eric Alan Stone
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Groombridge
Represented By: Vernon Michael Winters
Represented By: Jennifer H. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: Sue Wang
Represented By: Eric Alan Stone
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Groombridge
Represented By: Vernon Michael Winters
Represented By: Jennifer H. Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?