Pool v. F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Markell Pool
Defendant: Roche Laboratories, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Genentech USA, Inc., F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd. and Genentech, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01005
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY in Support (re #31 MOTION to Remand) filed by Markell Pool. (Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 34 ERRATA re #31 MOTION to Remand by Markell Pool. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 33 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION to Remand) filed by Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander A. Guney ISO, #2 Exhibit A to Guney Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Guney Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Guney Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Guney Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Guney Decl., #7 Declaration of Gerald Bohm ISO)(Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #30 Stipulation For Briefing Schedule. Hearing date of 5/2/2019 for motions is vacated; motion to remand filed by 3/22/2019 for hearing on 5/2/2019. Hearing date for motions vacated will be reset by the Court. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Remand filed by Markell Pool. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/5/2019. Replies due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jesse Creed, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #11 MOTION to Quash , #8 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss, #10 MOTION to Dismiss , 25 Clerk's Notice,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF, for Briefing Schedule on Motions filed by Markell Pool. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying #27 Motion to Relate Case. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Markell Pool re #26 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Markell Pool. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory M. Sonstein in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss, #11 MOTION to Quash , #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 3/22/2019. Replies due by 3/29/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE: Regarding #8 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss, #11 MOTION to Quash , #10 MOTION to Dismiss : Motions Hearing set for 5/2/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 24 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss rescheduling Motion for hearing before the Honorable Edward M. Chen, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, U.S. District Court, Northern District San Francisco, pursuant to the Order Reassigning Case, filed byF. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Och, Gina) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal,, of Action Under 28 USC Section 1441(b)(Diversity) by Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Weissenberger, Emily) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Markell Pool.. (Creed, Jesse) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/25/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019) Modified on 3/11/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Roche Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Roche Holding Ltd for Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc.. (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Roche Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Roche Holding Ltd for Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc.. (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd., Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc.. (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc... (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Quash , #8 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss, #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed byF. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd., Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #11 , #8 , #10 ) (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd... (Och, Gina) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd. re #8 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss (Och, Gina) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Quash filed by Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 3/22/2019. Replies due by 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bohm ISO, #2 Proposed Order)(Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 3/22/2019. Replies due by 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald Bohm ISO, #2 Proposed Order)(Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Robert Ferraro in Support of #8 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss filed byF. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Och, Gina) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss filed by F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 3/22/2019. Replies due by 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Och, Gina) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Dkt. No. 48 in case 3:18-cv-04565-JST Sheets et al v. F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd et al.). The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc. re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal,, (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc. of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court and Adverse Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 6(b) AND CIVIL L.R. 6-1(b) filed by Genentech USA, Inc., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc.. (Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/11/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CIV00431. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13116546). Filed byGenentech USA, Inc., F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd., Genentech, Inc., Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc., Roche Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Alexander Guney, #3 Exhibit 1-6 to Guney Declaration, #4 Declaration of Glenn Gray, #5 Declaration of Gerald Bohm, #6 Exhibit A to Bohm Declaration)(Guney, Alexander) (Filed on 2/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pool v. F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roche Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Michael F. Healy
Represented By: Emily Weissenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffmann-La Roche, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Michael F. Healy
Represented By: Emily Weissenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genentech USA, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Michael F. Healy
Represented By: Emily Weissenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Hoffman-La Roche, Ltd.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Gina Elizabeth Och
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander A. Guney
Represented By: Michael F. Healy
Represented By: Emily Weissenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markell Pool
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Represented By: Kevin Richard Boyle
Represented By: Jesse Max Creed
Represented By: Benjamin Israel Siminou
Represented By: Gregory Michael Sonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?