Ziel Equipment, Sales, and Services, LLC v. Greenbroz, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: ZIEL EQUIPMENT, SALES, AND SERVICES, LLC
Defendant: PUROGEN LABORATORIES, LLC and GREENBROZ, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01091
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 4/16/2019. Close of Fact Discovery: 11/15/2019. Case referred to ADR Unit for mediation with a panel mediator to be completed by 11/15/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor (Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019). Dispositive Motions to be heard by 4/22/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 08:30 AM, both in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR Time: 2:15-2:25. Plaintiff Attorneys: Anne S. Amaral and John McCarron. Defendant Attorneys: John Buche and Byron E. Ma. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ziel Equipment, Sales, and Services, LLC. (Amaral, Annie) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE - The #4 Motion to Dismiss has been rendered moot by the filing of a First Amended Complaint and Answer. As such the motion hearing set for 4/17/2019 is VACATED. The Case Management Conference is reset for 4/16/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Purogen Laboratories, LLC (Buche, John) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Greenbroz, Inc. (Buche, John) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ziel Equipment, Sales, and Services, LLC (Amaral, Annie) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S #16 [CORRECTED] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; by Greenbroz, Inc., Purogen Laboratories, LLC. (Buche, John) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Amaral, Annie) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 CORRECTED #15 AMENDED COMPLAINT ; against Greenbroz, Inc., Purogen Laboratories, LLC. Filed byZiel Equipment, Sales, and Services, LLC. (Amaral, Annie) (Filed on 3/21/2019) Modified on 3/22/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Greenbroz, Inc., Purogen Laboratories, LLC. Filed byZiel Equipment, Sales, and Services, LLC. (Amaral, Annie) (Filed on 3/20/2019) Modified on 3/21/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byZiel Equipment, Sales, and Services, LLC. (Amaral, Annie) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ziel Equipment, Sales, and Services, LLC (Amaral, Annie) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ziel Equipment, Sales, and Services, LLC (Amaral, Annie) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Annie Smith Amaral (Amaral, Annie) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion Hearing as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss set for 4/17/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/11/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Greenbroz, Inc., Purogen Laboratories, LLC.. (Buche, John) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greenbroz, Inc., Purogen Laboratories, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 3/20/2019. Replies due by 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities)(Buche, John) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-19-573543. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13129224). Filed by Greenbroz, Inc. Purogen Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buche, John) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziel Equipment, Sales, and Services, LLC v. Greenbroz, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUROGEN LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: John Karl Buche
Represented By: Byron E. Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENBROZ, INC.
Represented By: John Karl Buche
Represented By: Byron E. Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZIEL EQUIPMENT, SALES, AND SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Annie Smith Amaral
Represented By: Adrian J. Webber
Represented By: John Clifton McCarron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?