Zapp v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Peter Zapp
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp. and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01159
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/22/2019. Replies due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Awanyai, Stephanie) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/03/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 ADR Remark: ADR Phone conference scheduled for May 6 has been MOVED to May 16, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Dial-In Information remains the same [Dkt. 8]. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 ADR Remark: #8 ADR Phone Conference scheduled for April 1, 2019 has been MOVED to May 6, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Per parties' Stipulation. Call-In information remains the same. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. LaPorte no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by the Clerk on 3/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harutunian (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Harutunian, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PHH Mortgage Corporation.. (Awanyai, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting Early Assessment ADR Phone Conference in Mortgage Foreclosure Case on 4/1/19 at 10:30 a.m.. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 11, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Thirty Day Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Awanyai, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/1/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Marie Taylor ,Marcos D. Sasso and Stephanie I. Awanyai (Taylor, Tanya) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/15/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by PHH Mortgage Corporation identifying Corporate Parent PHH Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Taylor, Tanya) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; (NO PROCESS); from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV1900361. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13135500). Filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Tanya) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapp v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Tanya Marie Taylor
Represented By: Marcos D. Sasso
Represented By: Stephanie Ijeoma Awanyai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Zapp
Represented By: Malalai F Anbari
Represented By: Any Moskovian
Represented By: Romel Ambarchyan
Represented By: Michael Harutunian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?