Brignac v. Yelp Inc.
Plaintiff: Jaron Brignac and Jaron Lamar Brignac
Defendant: Yelp Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01188
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 73 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff informed the Court of his unavailability to attend motion hearing scheduled for today. Hearing set 9/24/2019 re: #64 Motion to Dismiss is VACATED and will be decided on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 72 REPLY to Opposition (re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint) filed by Yelp Inc.. (Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 71 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byJaron Lamar Brignac. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jaron Brignac)(Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #64 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 9/5/2019. Replies due by 9/12/2019. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AMENDED ORDER re #69 GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S #66 MOTION TO TREAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND GRANTING #68 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Order amends motion hearing date. Motion hearing is specially set to be heard 9/24/2019 at 3:00 p.m. Briefing remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/31/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part #66 Plaintiff's Motion to Treat Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as a Motion for Summary Judgment, and Granting #68 Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Handbook)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition filed by Jaron Lamar Brignac. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jaron Brignac, #2 Proposed Order)(Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's request to treat motion to dismiss as a motion for summary judgment #66 by 8/5/2019. Plaintiff need not file a reply. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION Request to Treat Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as a Summary Judgment filed by Jaron Lamar Brignac. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/6/2019. Replies due by 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Filing 65 Request for Judicial Notice re #64 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byYelp Inc.. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Yelp Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/29/2019. Replies due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian MacBean, #2 Proposed Order)(Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 63 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yelp Inc.. Filed by Jaron Lamar Brignac. (Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 7/1/2019) Modified on 7/3/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #23 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Denying #50 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 61 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/9/19, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #60 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2019. (Related documents(s) #60 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 9, 2019 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Yelp Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2019 re #50 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jaron Lamar Brignac, #23 filed by Yelp Inc. Written order to issue.Total Time in Court: 43 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Pro Se: Jaron Brignac (Court Call). Defendant Attorney: Brian Sutherland. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 58 Request for Judicial Notice re #55 Declaration in Support filed byJaron Lamar Brignac. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Jaron Lamar Brignac. (Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 5/9/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 56 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #50 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed by Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/10/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 55 Declaration of JARON BRIGNAC in Support of #54 Declaration in Support SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY filed byJaron Lamar Brignac. (Related document(s) #54 ) (Rodriguez, Patricia) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 54 Declaration of JARON BRIGNAC in Response to #53 Order filed by Jaron Lamar Brignac. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #50 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Re #50 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen denying #49 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 4, 2019 Filing 51 Proposed Order re #50 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jaron Lamar Brignac. (Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 5/4/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 50 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jaron Lamar Brignac. (Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 49 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Jaron Lamar Brignac. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Appear by Phone)(Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 48 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Brignac, Jaron) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yelp Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc. for Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 46 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [Proposed] Order filed by Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yelp Inc. (Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #43 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Jaron Brignac. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yelp Inc. re #41 Reply to Opposition/Response (Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY in Support (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint under Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by Yelp Inc.. (Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 4/25/2019) Modified on 4/26/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2019 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 38 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 40 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) filed by Jaron Brignac. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Yelp Inc. Opposition due by 4/18/2019. Reply due by 4/25/2019. Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED for 5/9/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 3/25/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 33 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Jaron Brignac. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/22/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Yelp Inc. of re #29 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Sutherland, Brian) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE as to #23 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/22/2019. Replies due by 3/29/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 29 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yelp Inc... (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 28 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Central District of California (Western Division-Los Angeles); Case Number 2:18-cv-10721-R-AS. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received. Modified on 3/5/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404(a) by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue #10 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is transferred to the Northern District of California. Case electronically transferred. ( MD JS-6, Case Terminated. ) (gk)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, The Court has determined that Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing filed by Plaintiff Jaron Brignac #18 set for hearing on March 4, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of March 4, 2019 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 19, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yelp Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) #23 served on 2/19/2019. (Sutherland, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Yelp Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law ISO Yelp Inc.'s Moiton to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Sutherland, Brian)
February 13, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yelp Inc., re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #21 served on 2/13/2019. (Sutherland, Brian)
February 13, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Hearing Evidentiary #18 filed by Defendant Yelp Inc.. (Sutherland, Brian)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, The Court has determined that Motion to Change Venue to United States District Court, Northern District of California filed by Defendant Yelp Inc. #10 set for hearing on February 19, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of February 19, 2019 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER CORRECTLY SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING #18 by Judge Manuel L. Real. Plaintiff improperly noticed his Motion for An Evidentiary Hearing #18 before Magistrate Judge Sagar on March 7, 2019. Counsel and parties are now notified that Plaintiff's Motion for An Evidentiary Hearing #18 is hereby set for hearing on March 4, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. before Judge Manuel L. Real in Courtroom 880, 8th floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S.Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Yelp, Inc. and Does 1-10, inclusive; amending Complaint #1 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff Jaron Brignac. (gk)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yelp Inc., re Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #15 , Reply (Motion related), #14 Corrected served on 2/5/2019. (Sutherland, Brian)
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION for an Evidentiary Hearing filed by Plaintiff Jaron Brignac. (gk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yelp Inc., re Reply (Motion related), #14 served on 2/5/2019. (Sutherland, Brian)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court, Northern District of California #10 filed by Defendant Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Sutherland, Brian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to Defendant Yelp Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue (28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a)) #10 ; Declaration of Jaron Brignac filed by Plaintiff Jaron Brignac. (gk)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Intent to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jaron Brignac. (gk)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yelp Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court, Northern District of California #10 served on January 22, 2019. (Sutherland, Brian)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court, Northern District of California filed by Defendant Yelp Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit to MacBean Declaration, #4 Exhibit to MacBean Declaration, #5 Exhibit to MacBean Declaration, #6 Exhibit to MacBean Declaration, #7 Exhibit to MacBean Declaration, #8 Proposed Order) (Sutherland, Brian)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yelp Inc., re Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #8 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) #7 served on 01-18-2019. (Sutherland, Brian)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yelp Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) #7 served on 1-18-2019. (Sutherland, Brian)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Yelp Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Sutherland, Brian)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Yelp Inc., re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #4 served on 12/31/2018. (Sutherland, Brian)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Yelp Inc. answer now due 1/18/2019, filed by defendant Yelp Inc..(Sutherland, Brian)
December 28, 2018 CONFORMED COPY COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jaron Brignac in Los Angeles Superior Court on 11/19/2018, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Yelp Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 12/28/2018. (Sutherland, Brian)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Yelp Inc., (Sutherland, Brian)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles, case number 18CHCV00101 Receipt No: 0973-22961839 - (Filing Fee: $400.00) filed by Defendant Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Register of Actions, #(2) Exhibit Complaint, #(3) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Brian A Sutherland added to party Yelp Inc.(pty:dft))(Sutherland, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brignac v. Yelp Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp Inc.
Represented By: Brian A Sutherland
Represented By: Joshua Douglas Anderson
Represented By: Brian Adair Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaron Brignac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaron Lamar Brignac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?