Facebook, Inc. v. Sluchevsky et al
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Andrey Gorbachov and Gleb Sluchevsky
Case Number: 3:2019cv01277
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #23 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 23 Fifth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 22 Clerk's Notice Re: ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants Gleb Sluchevsky and Andrey Gorbachov on March 13, 2020. (Related documents(s) #19 ) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #20 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference reset for 5/21/2020 0at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 20 Fourth MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Entry of Default for all Defendants filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls, #3 Declaration of David J. Steele)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to the unavailability of the Court, the initial case management conference scheduled for March 12, 2020 is continued to March 26, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. The joint case management conference statement shall be filed by March 19, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Steele, David) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #15 Motion to Continue Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Third MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele, #3 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls)(Steele, David) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #13 Motion to Continue. Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele, #3 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls)(Steele, David) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #11 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference and All Related Dates. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/5/2019 0at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and All Related Dates filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Celeste Ingalls, #2 Declaration of David J. Steele, #3 Exhibit 1)(Steele, David) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc... (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Andrey Gorbachov. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Gleb Sluchevsky. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/22/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Facebook, Inc. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrey Gorbachov, Gleb Sluchevsky ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13156448.). Filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, David) (Filed on 3/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. Sluchevsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrey Gorbachov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gleb Sluchevsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: David Jefferson Steele
Represented By: Steven Erick Lauridsen
Represented By: Howard Alan Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?