Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Defendant: Gary Rowe and Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01421
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 25 ADR Clerk's Notice Vacating Appointment of Mediator, Gerald F. George #24 . The ADR Program will appoint another Mediator as soon as possible. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Gerald F. George as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER (BENCH): Date to seek leave to add new parties or amend pleadings: 9/30/2019. Updated joint case management conference statement due 9/19/2019; Further Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 a.m.ADR completion date 8/30/2019.Non-expert discovery due 1/23/2020.Expert disclosures due 1/23/2020; Rebuttals due 2/7/2020.Expert discovery due 3/8/2020.Last hearing date for dispositive motions and/or further case management conference: 5/7/2020 at 9:30 a.m./11:00 a.m.Meet and confer re pretrial filings due 6/9/2020.Pretrial filings due 6/11/2020; Oppositions, objections, exhibits, and depo designations due 6/18/2020.Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 7/20/2020 - 7/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 06/20/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2019. Scheduling order to issue. (Not Reported). Plaintiff's Attorney (Phone): Hans Herb. Defendants' Attorney: Wallace Smith. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #20 Ex Parte Application to Appear at Case Management Conference by Telephone. Parties are to make arrangements through CourtCall. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 Ex Parte Application to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc. (Smith, Wallace) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc., Gary Rowe Defendants' Certificate of Interested Entities or Pesons (Smith, Wallace) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc., Gary Rowe. (Smith, Wallace) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc., Gary Rowe.. (Smith, Wallace) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #14 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Mediation by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Plaintiff (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/23/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defendants' Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial byGolden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc., Gary Rowe. (Smith, Wallace) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc. served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. Gary Rowe served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC.. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc., Gary Rowe. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC AMENDED. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/2/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunction, Declaratory Relief, Civil Penalties and Remediation against Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc., Gary Rowe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13180909.). Filed byEden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Richmond Notice Letter, #2 Exhibit A-San Jose Notice Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herb, Hans) (Filed on 3/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC v. Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group, LLC
Represented By: Hans William Herb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Rowe
Represented By: Wallace Eric Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate Petroleum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Wallace Eric Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?