First Class Oak Creek Apartments, LP v. Conte et al

Plaintiff: First Class Oak Creek Apartments, LP
Defendant: Alondra Doe and Isabella Conte
Case Number: 3:2019cv01432
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 Acknowledgment of Receipt of certified copy of remand order and docket entries from Superior Court of the Sonoma Judicial District. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 certified copy of remand order and docket entries mailed to Superior Court of the Sonoma Judicial District, County of Sonoma. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND REMANDING CASE for #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Remand. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statements due 6/19/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2019 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 3/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Remand by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Objections due by 4/3/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 3/20/2019 a copy of this report and recommendation was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Re Applications to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 3/20/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a United States District Judge because either one or more of the parties has requested reassignment to a United States District Judge or has not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the District Judge to whom this case is reassigned. All hearing dates presently scheduled before the current Magistrate Judge are vacated and should be re-noticed for hearing before the judge to whom this case is reassigned. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 3/20/2019 a copy of this notice was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by First Class Oak Creek Apartments, LP.. (Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/3/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 3/20/2019 a copy of this notice was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Isabella Conte, Alondra Doe. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alondra Doe. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Isabella Conte. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING); from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is MCV-248095. (IFP). Filed byIsabella Conte, Alondra Doe. Consent/Declination due by 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019) Modified on 3/20/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Class Oak Creek Apartments, LP v. Conte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alondra Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Class Oak Creek Apartments, LP
Represented By: Ryan Austin Mayberry
Represented By: Todd Bennett Rothbard
Represented By: Brian Skarbek
Represented By: Steven Tafoya Naumchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?