Oakland International Housing Partners, L.P. v. Powell

Plaintiff: Oakland International Housing Partners, L.P.
Defendant: Joe Powell
Case Number: 3:2019cv01433
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 Receipt from Superior Court of California County of Alameda. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order on Report and Recommendations: The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 4/15/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: Certified copy of Remand order and Docket sheet sent with transmittal letter. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO REMAND by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2019)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 3/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The undersigned orders the clerk of court to reassign this case to a district judge. The undersigned recommends that the newly assigned district judge sua sponte remand this case back to the California Superior Court for lack of federal subject-matter jurisdiction. Objections due by 4/3/2019. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Oakland International Housing Partners, L.P... (Rothbard, Todd) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Self Help Flyer, #3 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joe Powell (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joe Powell. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Alameda. Their case number is RG19006886. (IFP). Filed byJoe Powell. Consent/Declination due by 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakland International Housing Partners, L.P. v. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakland International Housing Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Todd Bennett Rothbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?