Diane Blackman et al v. Teespring, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Olivier Delmas, David Olenick, Alan Pirie, Karin Taylor, Nina Gronlund, Diane Blackman, Jay Fleck, Jennifer Le Feuvre, Damien Mason, Nathan Ryder, Doug Cavanaugh, Zach Terrell, Sierra Tiegs, Eric Fan, Liza Phoenix, Agata Kamienska, Jennifer Smith, Jamie Marshall, Jynell St. James, Benjamin Geiger, Balazs Solti, Chow Hon Lam, Mario Sanchez Nevado, Maike Vierkant, Stephen Harris, NickerStickers, Inc., Neil Hampton and William Chua Tiong Keng
Defendant: Teespring, Inc. and Does 1-3
Case Number: 3:2019cv01494
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #27 Motion to Sever. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for August 1, 2019 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2019 re #27 MOTION to Sever filed by Teespring, Inc. Motion taken under submission; Court to issue an order. Case Management Conference set for August 1, 2019 is VACATED.Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Justin Gomes. Defendant Attorney: Anthony Weibell, Kelly Knoll. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 Appendix ADR Certification - All Plaintiffs)(Gomes, Justin) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for July 18, 2019 is continued to August 1, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by July 25, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 40 ADR Clerks SECOND Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #27 MOTION to Sever . Motion Hearing previously set for 6/27/2019 has been continued to 7/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for June 27, 2019 is continued to July 18, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by July 11, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 37 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY (re #27 MOTION to Sever ) filed byTeespring, Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION to Sever ) filed byDiane Blackman, Doug Cavanaugh, Olivier Delmas, Eric Fan, Jay Fleck, Benjamin Geiger, Nina Gronlund, Neil Hampton, Stephen Harris, Agata Kamienska, William Chua Tiong Keng, Chow Hon Lam, Jennifer Le Feuvre, Jamie Marshall, Damien Mason, NickerStickers, Inc., David Olenick, Liza Phoenix, Alan Pirie, Nathan Ryder, Mario Sanchez Nevado, Jennifer Smith, Balazs Solti, Jynell St. James, Karin Taylor, Zach Terrell, Sierra Tiegs, Maike Vierkant. (Gomes, Justin) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #32 Stipulation. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Sever . Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 33 Renotice motion hearing re #27 MOTION to Sever filed byTeespring, Inc.. (Related document(s) #27 ) (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Teespring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony J Weibell)(Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Seeborg's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/12/2019 (cl, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 28 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Diane Blackman, Doug Cavanaugh, Olivier Delmas, Eric Fan, Jay Fleck, Benjamin Geiger, Nina Gronlund, Neil Hampton, Stephen Harris, Agata Kamienska, William Chua Tiong Keng, Chow Hon Lam, Jennifer Le Feuvre, Jamie Marshall, Damien Mason, NickerStickers, Inc., David Olenick, Liza Phoenix, Alan Pirie, Nathan Ryder, Mario Sanchez Nevado, Jennifer Smith, Balazs Solti, Jynell St. James, Karin Taylor, Zach Terrell, Sierra Tiegs, Maike Vierkant.. (Gomes, Justin) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Sever filed by Teespring, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 4/16/2019. Replies due by 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Marie Knoll on Behalf of Defendant Teespring, Inc. (Knoll, Kelly) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 25 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-08357. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 3/25/2019 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall transferring case to United States District Court, Northern District of California, San Francisco. Entire case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's request for leave to file response to post-hearing submission of plaintiffs, filed on March 8, 2019 #21 . The Court having read and considered said request, hereby DENIES said request. (shb)
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST for Leave to file Response to Post-Hearing Submission of Plaintiffs #19 #20 filed by defendant Teespring, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Teespring, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Submission of Evidence re Teespring's Motion to Sever and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order) (Weibell, Anthony)
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Benjamin Geiger in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and to Sever #11 filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Geiger. (Burroughs, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Emily A. Danchuk, Esq. in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and to Sever #11 Supplement Submission per Court Order filed by Plaintiff Diane Blackman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D)(Burroughs, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Anthony J Weibell in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and to Sever #11 per MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION #15 filed by Defendant Teespring, Inc. (Weibell, Anthony)
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Christine Liu in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and to Sever #11 per MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION #15 filed by Defendant Teespring, Inc. (Weibell, Anthony)
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTES OF HEARING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER AND MOTION TO DISMISS INTHE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE #11 held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the case. Following discussions with the parties, the Court advises counsel that the motion is taken under submission and a written order will issue. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (shb)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On February 26, 2019, the Court held a hearing on Defendants motion to transfer the case to the Northern District of California for improper venue. (Dkt. No. 11.) The parties requested a ruling on the motion based on the allegations in the complaint. Neither party presented evidence. The parties are ordered to file supporting evidence for their positions on proper venue, such as a declaration or affidavit, no later than March 5, 2019. (See Local Rule 7.5(b).) (shb)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and to Sever #11 filed by Defendant Teespring, Inc. (Weibell, Anthony)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and to Sever #11 filed by Plaintiffs Diane Blackman, Doug Cavanaugh, Olivier Delmas, Eric Fan, Jay Fleck, Benjamin Geiger, Nina Gronlund, Neil Hampton, Stephen Harris, Agata Kamienska, William Chua Tiong Keng, Chow Hon Lam, Jennifer Le Feuvre, Jamie Marshall, Damien Mason, NickerStickers, Inc., David Olenick, Liza Phoenix, Alan Pirie, Nathan Ryder, Mario Sanchez Nevado, Jennifer Smith, Balazs Solti, Jynell St. James, Karin Taylor, Zach Terrell, Sierra Tiegs, Maike Vierkant. (Burroughs, Scott)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Teespring, Inc, (Weibell, Anthony)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and to Sever filed by defendant Teespring, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weibell, Anthony)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Teespring, Inc answer now due 1/25/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Teespring, Inc.(Attorney Anthony J Weibell added to party Teespring, Inc(pty:dft))(Weibell, Anthony)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Diane Blackman. upon Teespring, Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Anthony J. Weibell, Attorney for Defendant. (Burroughs, Scott)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Teespring, Inc. (Attachments: #1 page 2) (esa)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Diane Blackman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Page 2 cont'd)(Burroughs, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Diane Blackman. (Burroughs, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Diane Blackman. (Burroughs, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Appendix Page 2 cont'd)(Burroughs, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 09/27/2018, receipt number 0973-22495121), filed by Plaintiffs William Chua Tiong Keng, Nathan Ryder, Nina Gronlund, Zach Terrell, NickerStickers, Inc., Doug Cavanaugh, Jennifer Smith, Diane Blackman, David Olenick, Balazs Solti, Mario Sanchez Nevado, Jennifer Le Feuvre, Sierra Tiegs, Karin Taylor, Benjamin Geiger, Maike Vierkant, Olivier Delmas, Stephen Harris, Chow Hon Lam, Alan Pirie, Jamie Marshall, Damien Mason, Neil Hampton, Eric Fan, Jynell St. James, Liza Phoenix, Agata Kamienska, Jay Fleck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I - P. 1, #10 Exhibit I - Pt. 2, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q - Pt. 1, #19 Exhibit Q - Pt. 2, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S - Pt. 1, #22 Exhibit S - Pt. 2, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V - Pt. 1, #26 Exhibit V - Pt. 2, #27 Exhibit V - Pt. 3, #28 Exhibit V - Pt. 4, #29 Exhibit V - Pt. 5, #30 Exhibit V - Pt. 6, #31 Exhibit V - Pt. 7, #32 Exhibit V - Pt. 8, #33 Exhibit V - Pt. 9, #34 Exhibit W, #35 Exhibit X - Pt. 1, #36 Exhibit X - Pt. 2, #37 Exhibit Y, #38 Exhibit Z, #39 Exhibit AA, #40 Exhibit BB) (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Diane Blackman(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Doug Cavanaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Olivier Delmas(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Eric Fan(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jay Fleck(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Benjamin Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Nina Gronlund(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Neil Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Stephen Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Agata Kamienska(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party William Chua Tiong Keng(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Chow Hon Lam(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jennifer Le Feuvre(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jamie Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Damien Mason(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party NickerStickers, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party David Olenick(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Liza Phoenix(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Alan Pirie(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Nathan Ryder(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Mario Sanchez Nevado(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jennifer Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Balazs Solti(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jynell St. James(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Karin Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Zach Terrell(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Sierra Tiegs(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Maike Vierkant(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diane Blackman et al v. Teespring, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teespring, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Represented By: Aaron D Hendelman
Represented By: Kelly Marie Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivier Delmas
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Olenick
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Pirie
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Taylor
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Gronlund
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Blackman
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Fleck
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Le Feuvre
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Mason
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Ryder
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Cavanaugh
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Terrell
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Tiegs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Fan
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Phoenix
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agata Kamienska
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Smith
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Marshall
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jynell St. James
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Geiger
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balazs Solti
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chow Hon Lam
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Sanchez Nevado
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maike Vierkant
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Harris
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NickerStickers, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Hampton
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Chua Tiong Keng
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin Michael Gomes
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?