Danford Foundation et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Danford Foundation, Katherine Fisher and George Fisher
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Devon Silvera, Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo Foundation, WELLS FARGO & COMPAY and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01512
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order, signed 5/20/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #18 Stipulation to Stay Matter Pending Arbitration. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Devon Silvera by Danford Foundation, Katherine Fisher (Mann, Paul) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephone Conference re: Stipulation to Stay Matter Pending Arbitration #18 held on 5/10/2019. Counsel for Plaintiffs will talk to their clients regarding the unserved defendant. By May 17, 2019, counsel to file a request for dismissal without prejudice as to the unserved defendant. Upon the filing of the request, the Court will sign the stipulation. (FTR Time: 9:37-9:46.)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Ted Hanning; Paul Mann.Attorney for Defendants: Evelina Manukyan. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 5/10/2019 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING as to #18 STIPULATION TO STAY MATTER PENDING ARBITRATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER . Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Parties shall make arrangements through CourtCall at 866-582-6878. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation.. (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Danford Foundation, Katherine Fisher.. (Mann, Paul) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Danford Foundation, Katherine Fisher. (Mann, Paul) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: All Defendants, except for Devon Silvera, shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Foundation and Kent Mannina's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint byKent Mannina, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation. (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 Refund Status re #11 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 Refund Status re #10 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal 95945 by Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation. (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 3/26/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal by Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation. (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 3/26/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 Refund Status re #3 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Refund Status re #2 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation re #1 Notice of Removal. (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WELLS FARGO & COMPANY, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation, Kent Mannina [err101]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings & Other Documents & Civil Cover Sheet [err201] (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Refund by Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation. (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Refund, on Receipt No. 0971-13196101 by Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Foundation. (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1441 from San Mateo County Superior. Their case number is 18CIV06625. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13196166). Filed by Kent Mannina, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Manukyan, Evelina) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danford Foundation et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Evelina Manukyan
Represented By: Mark Ian Wraight
Represented By: Andrew S. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Silvera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Mannina
Represented By: Evelina Manukyan
Represented By: Mark Ian Wraight
Represented By: Andrew S. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Foundation
Represented By: Evelina Manukyan
Represented By: Mark Ian Wraight
Represented By: Andrew S. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO & COMPAY
Represented By: Evelina Manukyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Mark Ian Wraight
Represented By: Evelina Manukyan
Represented By: Andrew S. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danford Foundation
Represented By: Paul Anson Mann
Represented By: Ted Josef Hannig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Fisher
Represented By: Paul Anson Mann
Represented By: Ted Josef Hannig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Fisher
Represented By: Paul Anson Mann
Represented By: Ted Josef Hannig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?