Mori v. Taylor Machine Works, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Tameika Mori
Defendant: Taylor Machine Works, Inc. and Volvo Group North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01539
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/2/19. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/28/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. Jury Selection set for 11/9/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2020 03:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Deadline to Amend Pleadings: 12/20/19. By 7/31/19, counsel shall inform the Court of the agreed upon ADR process they will participate in. The mediation deadline is 4/17/20. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 Disregard entry - see document #18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/28/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. Jury Selection set for 11/9/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2020 03:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Deadline to Amend Pleadings: 12/20/19. By 7/31/19, counsel shall inform the Court of the agreed upon ADR process they will participate in. The mediation deadline is 4/17/19. Initial disclosures will be produced on 8/2/19. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/1/2019) Modified on 7/2/2019 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Villeggiante, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC and Tameika Mori. (Dabrowski, Steven) (Filed on 6/21/2019) Modified on 6/24/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: 6/38/19 Initial Case Management Conference.The Court has received requests to appear by phone. The Court currently has Mr. Dabrowski, Elizabeth Williams and Aaron Cargain appearing by phone. The Court will initiate the conference call. If any other parties request to appear by phone, counsel will be directed to arrange for a conference line and provide the Court with the call in number and the passcode to access the conference line. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dabrowski, Steven) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Volvo Group North America, LLC's Amended Notice of Interested Parties (Dabrowski, Steven) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Michael Cargain (Cargain, Aaron) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Taylor Machine Works, Inc.. (Williams, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 DISREGARD ENTRY - ERRONEOUS ATTACHMENT - CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/16/2019 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Volvo Group North America, LLC.. (Dabrowski, Steven) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tameika Mori.. (Villeggiante, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/25/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC Statistical Da ta Current: Origin is 2 (Removal From State Court) not 1 (Original Proceeding) (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC Case Title Ente red Incorrectly. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Answer to #1 Removal Complaint (Page 15); byVolvo Group North America, LLC. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1441(b) Diversity; (NO PROCESS); from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG19004473. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13200936). Filed byVolvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Notice of Interested Parties)(Dabrowski, Steven) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/26/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mori v. Taylor Machine Works, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Machine Works, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Williams, Esq.
Represented By: Aaron Michael Cargain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Dabrowski
Represented By: Anthony Evan Sonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameika Mori
Represented By: Michael Joseph Villeggiante, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?