Chicas Funes v. Nielson et al
Defendant: Richard T. Valeika, Kristjen Nielson, John Kramar, William P. Barr and Francis Cissna
Petitioner: Julio Cesar Chicas Funes
Case Number: 3:2019cv01542
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 certified copy of remand order and docket entries mailed to USCIS, San Francisco Office. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (tnS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #13 Stipulation Remanding Case to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Remanding Case to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Pursuant to 8 U.S.C. 1447(b) filed by William P. Barr, Francis Cissna, John Kramar, Kristjen Nielson, Richard T. Valeika. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William P. Barr, Francis Cissna, John Kramar, Kristjen Nielson, Richard T. Valeika.. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 Acknowledgment of Receipt from USMS re summons. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan David Weissglass (Weissglass, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 **Delivered service packet to the U.S. Marshal Service Post Box in the Clerk's Office mailroom*** (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Francis Cissna, John Kramar, Kristjen Nielson, Richard T. Valeika, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM 285, #2 USM 285, #3 USM 285, #4 USM 285, #5 USM 285, #6 USM 285)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Julio Cesar Chicas Funes.. (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Weissglass (Weissglass, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Julio Cesar Chicas Funes. (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for De Novo Naturalization Hearing and other relief against All Defendants. Filed byJulio Cesar Chicas Funes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B (part 2), #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heilbrun, Sarah Kate) (Filed on 3/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicas Funes v. Nielson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T. Valeika
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristjen Nielson
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Cissna
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julio Cesar Chicas Funes
Represented By: Jonathan David Weissglass
Represented By: Sarah Kate Heilbrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?