Bullock v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Kevin Bullock
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01583
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Bullock (Ochs, Jason) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Kevin Bullock . (Ochs, Jason) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 28, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Bullock v. Monsanto, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-01583 VC. cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Kevin Bullock . (Ochs, Jason) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13205837.). Filed byKevin Bullock. (Ochs, Jason) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been assigned to Judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS 44 (Rev. 02/19). Please complete correct Civil Cover Sheet of JS-CAND 44(Rev.06/17) and re-file in its entirety as a separate docket entry. re re #2 filed by Kevin Bullock (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019) Modified on 3/27/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bullock
Represented By: Jason Edward Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?