Woelich v. Boutique Air, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mr. Robert J Woelich, 2 and Robert J. Woelich
Defendant: Boutique Air, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01591
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO DISMISS ALL ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL PARTIES filed by Robert J. Woelich. (Dworkin, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Robert J. Woelich Joint Notice of Conditional Settlement and Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Dworkin, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Boutique Air, Inc... (Weintraub, Brad) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/10/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 BOUTIQUE AIR INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byBoutique Air, Inc.. (Weintraub, Brad) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to File Answer to Complaint filed by Robert J. Woelich. (Dworkin, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Initial Order, Standing Order, ADR, etc. served on Boutique Air, Inc. c/o Registered Agent on March 29, 2019, filed by Robert J. Woelich. (Dworkin, Michael) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert J. Woelich.. (Dworkin, Michael) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Boutique Air, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dworkin, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13206858.). Filed byRobert J Woelich, 2. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dworkin, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woelich v. Boutique Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Robert J Woelich, 2
Represented By: Michael Leonard Dworkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Woelich
Represented By: Michael Leonard Dworkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boutique Air, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Michael Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?