Scheller v. Nutanix, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Scheller, Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun
Defendant: Duston M. Williams, Nutanix, Inc. and Dheeraj Pandey
Petitioner: David Panczner, City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System, Ronald Castillo, Jose Flores, Heidi Zapf, Shimon Hedvat, Mamood Sabahi, John Barnes and Frank H. May
Case Number: 3:2019cv01651
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF re #17 , #19 , #22 , #26 , #32 , #35 , #37 , #47 Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Motions to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/10/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/10/2019 before Judge William H. Orrick by Shimon Hedvat, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2019 re #17 , #19 , #22 , #32 , #35 , #47 Motions to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 84 Statement of Non-Opposition re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun filed byBristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jose Flores (Ruthizer, Joshua) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order to Continue Case Management Conference by Judge William H. Orrick granting #77 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Richard W. Gonnello. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Francis P. McConville. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Sherif Morsy. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Joshua W. Ruthizier. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Jose Flores, Ryan Scheller. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION f& [PROPOSED] ORDER or leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13465123.) filed by Jose Flores. (Ruthizer, Joshua) (Filed on 6/25/2019) Modified on 6/26/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY (re #37 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byFrank H. May. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 74 REPLY (re #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byJose Flores. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 73 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byShimon Hedvat. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration)(Nespole, Gregory) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 13, 2019 Reset Motion Hearing on 7/10/2019 09:00 AM (to correct time). (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 72 CLERK'S NOTICE - Reset Case Management Conference and Hearing as to #47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidate Cases, #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and to Consolidate Cases, #19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and to Consolidate Cases, #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #37 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and to Consolidate Cases, #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing reset for 7/10/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 71 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali in Support of #69 Opposition/Response to Motion, FRANK MAYS RESPONSE TO COMPETING LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS Thereof CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [69-1 to 69-8] filed byFrank H. May. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #69 ) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 70 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #37 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun, #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byJose Flores. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 69 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byFrank H. May. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin Heikali, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 68 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #37 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byShimon Hedvat. (Nespole, Gregory) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE by Mamood Sabahi Notice of Non-opposition to Competing Motions for Consolidation of Related Cases, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE by City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System re #19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Gregory Mark Nespole on behalf of Shimon Hedvat (Nespole, Gregory) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice . On behalf of Francis P. McConville ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13416591.) filed by Bristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McConville, Francis) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/7/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Sherief Morsy by Dillon Joseph Hagius on behalf of Frank H. May (Hagius, Dillon) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13414182.) filed by Frank H. May. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Morsy, Sherief) (Filed on 6/6/2019) Modified on 6/6/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13414167.) filed by Frank H. May. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gonnello, Richard) (Filed on 6/6/2019) Modified on 6/6/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Heikali (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Robert C. Finkel. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE by David Panczner re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTION) (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13409777.) filed by Jose Flores. (Finkel, Robert) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by John Barnes, Ronald Castillo, Heidi Zapf re #47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF THE NUTANIX INVESTOR GROUP TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Judge William H. Orrick granting #54 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Nutanix, Inc., Dheeraj Pandey, Duston M. Williams. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Gregory M. Nespole. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #1 Corrected Image) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2019 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE - Resetting Motion Hearing as to #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and to Consolidate Cases and Initial Case Management Conference to for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor (consolidating all pending proceedings for this date). Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13389117.) filed by Shimon Hedvat. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Nespole, Gregory) (Filed on 5/29/2019) Modified on 5/30/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2019 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by John Barnes, Ronald Castillo, Heidi Zapf re #47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of John Barnes, Ronald Castillo, Heidi Zapf (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 48 Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti in Support of #47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byJohn Barnes, Ronald Castillo, Heidi Zapf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #47 ) (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by John Barnes, Heidi Zapf, Ronald Castillo. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Replies due by 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun Filed on behalf of Francis P. McConville by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Bristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun Filed on behalf of Eric J. Belfi by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Bristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun Filed on behalf of Christopher J. Keller by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Bristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Richard W. Gonnello by Dillon Joseph Hagius on behalf of Frank H. May (Hagius, Dillon) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun Filed on behalf of Frank Busch by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Bristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Dillon Joseph Hagius by Dillon Joseph Hagius on behalf of Frank H. May (Hagius, Dillon) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Bristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Frank H. May (Hagius, Dillon) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Frank H. May. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Replies due by 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dillon Hagius, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. Hagius, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. Hagius, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. Hagius, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. Hagius, #6 Proposed Order)(Hagius, Dillon) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 36 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun filed byBristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #35 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun filed by Bristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Replies due by 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Flores re #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 Declaration of Robert C. Finkel in Support of #32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byJose Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Wolf Popper Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Berman Tabacco Resume)(Related document(s) #32 ) (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Jose Flores. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Replies due by 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mamood Sabahi (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Mamood Sabahi (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Mamood Sabahi (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Mamood Sabahi (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein in Support of #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byMamood Sabahi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Mamood Sabahi. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Replies due by 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shimon Hedvat (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Counsel PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Adam Christopher McCall on behalf of Shimon Hedvat (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 Declaration of Adam C. McCall in Support of #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byShimon Hedvat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #22 ) (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Shimon Hedvat. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Replies due by 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by John T. Jasnoch on behalf of City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 Declaration of John T. Jasnoch in Support of #19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byCity of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Replies due by 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jasnoch, John) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Lesley F. Portnoy in Support of #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byDavid Panczner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by David Panczner. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/11/2019. Replies due by 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ryan Scheller. Service waived by Duston M. Williams waiver sent on 4/4/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ryan Scheller. Service waived by Dheeraj Pandey waiver sent on 4/4/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ryan Scheller. Service waived by Nutanix, Inc. waiver sent on 4/4/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nutanix, Inc., Dheeraj Pandey, Duston M. Williams identifying Other Affiliate Argonaut Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Hudson Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Lloyds of London, Other Affiliate Allianz Global Risks U.S. Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc./National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Other Affiliate Markel American Insurance Company for Nutanix, Inc.. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutanix, Inc., Dheeraj Pandey, Duston M. Williams identifying Corporate Parent no parent corporation for Nutanix, Inc.. (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ignacio Evaristo Salceda & Boris Feldman (Salceda, Ignacio) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Ryan Scheller Notice of Plaintiff Ryan Scheller's Announcement of Pending Action Against Nutanix, Inc., as Required by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 and Civil L.R. 23-1(a) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Nutanix, Inc., Dheeraj Pandey, Duston M. Williams. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. SEC Class Action Notice due by 4/19/2019. Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2019 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 3/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryan Scheller (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Aidan Chowning Poppler on behalf of Ryan Scheller (Poppler, Aidan) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Robert C. Finkel) by Nicole Catherine Lavallee on behalf of Ryan Scheller (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Nicole Catherine Lavallee on behalf of Ryan Scheller (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number; 0971-13216763.). Filed by Ryan Scheller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019) Modified on 4/2/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scheller v. Nutanix, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Scheller
Represented By: Nicole Catherine Lavallee
Represented By: Aidan Chowning Poppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol County Retirement System
Represented By: Francis P McConville
Represented By: James Matthew Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph S. Maroun
Represented By: Francis P McConville
Represented By: James Matthew Wagstaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duston M. Williams
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutanix, Inc.
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dheeraj Pandey
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Panczner
Represented By: Lesley F. Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System
Represented By: John T. Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Castillo
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Flores
Represented By: Nicole Catherine Lavallee
Represented By: Joshua Wolf Ruthizer
Represented By: Robert C. Finkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Heidi Zapf
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shimon Hedvat
Represented By: Adam Christopher McCall
Represented By: Gregory Mark Nespole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mamood Sabahi
Represented By: Reed R. Kathrein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Barnes
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank H. May
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Richard W. Gonnello
Represented By: Sherief Morsy
Represented By: Dillon Joseph Hagius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?