Bradbury v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Glenn D Bradbury
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv01667
Filed: March 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 SSA Administrative Transcript Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Administrative Record in Paper and Electronic Form by Nancy Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5, #6 Part 6, #7 Part 7, #8 Part 8, #9 Part 9, #10 Part 10, #11 Part 11, #12 Part 12, #13 Part 13, #14 Part 14, #15 Part 15, #16 Part 16, #17 Part 17, #18 Part 18, #19 Part 19, #20 Part 20, #21 Part 21, #22 Part 22, #23 Part 23, #24 Part 24)(Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint; by Nancy Berryhill. (Jenkins, Chantal) (Filed on 7/2/2019) Modified on 7/3/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glenn D Bradbury. US Attorney General, US Department of Justice served on 4/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glenn D Bradbury. Nancy Berryhill, Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/4/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glenn D Bradbury. US Attorney's Office for the Northern District of California served on 4/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy Berryhill.. (Jenkins, Chantal) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIPT OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the U.S. Marshal Service Regarding Service on Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of Social Security; US Attorney's Office for the Northern District of California; US Attorney General, US Department of Justice. Re #7 Summons Issued (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 04/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Glenn D Bradbury.. (Zieman, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Glenn D Bradbury. (Zieman, Richard) (Filed on 3/30/2019)
March 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filed byGlenn D Bradbury. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Zieman, Richard) (Filed on 3/30/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradbury v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Chantal Renee Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn D Bradbury
Represented By: Richard Paul Zieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?