Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: UNILOC Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc USA, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01697
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
2 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #75 Stipulation re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/10/2019. CASE REFERRED to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Discovery. The parties will wait to file claim construction briefing until after the IPR proceedings taking place in December of this year in the Samsung matters. All dates and deadlines leading up to claim construction briefing will be in effect and are self-executing based on the Local Rules. Updated Joint Case Management Statement is due by 1/15/2020. The updated CMS should include a reminder of the discussions which took place today and also propose a schedule for the remainder of the case. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor.Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: James Foster. Defendant Attorney: Christine Corbett. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION FOR PATENT LITIGATION filed by UNILOC Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Foster, James) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Van Handel.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 73 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT UPDATED filed by UNILOC Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Foster, James) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Michael Van Handel) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13485802.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 71 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 7/3/2019 TO 7/10/2019. Judge Chhabria will not be holding court hearings on 7/3/2019, and therefore is resetting this matter. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #69 Motion to Continue the Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference (Stipulated Motion) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order as Modified by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #65 Administrative Motion to Reschedule the Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 67 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE DETERMINING THAT NO CASES ARE RELATED. re dkt. 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12 in case 19-cv-01691-JST Uniloc USA, Inc., et al v. Apple Inc. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 65 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by UNILOC Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Responses due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 6/11/2019 TO 6/12/2019. Judge Chhabria's CMC calendar has shifted from Tuesday afternoons to Wednesday mornings, therefore this case is being rescheduled consistent with the change. Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement byApple, Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 62 *****PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKET ENTRY MADE IN ERROR.***** CLERK'S NOTICE DETERMINING THAT NO CASES ARE RELATED. re dkt. 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12 in case 19-cv-01691-JST Uniloc USA, Inc., et al v. Apple Inc. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/22/2019 (mllS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2019 Filing 61 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Amended) (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 60 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 59 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 57 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding Responsive Pleading filed by Apple, Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 53 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 51 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 50 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00293. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING #32 Motion to Change Venue and this cause is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 6, 2019 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew Stein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Guaragna Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Guaragna, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 45 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., re #32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Declaration of James J. Foster, #40 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Setting Deadlines. ORDER continuing Initial Pretrial Conference until further notice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 43 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on September 11, 2018, Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/11/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2018, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
September 13, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #35 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. (td)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING #35 Motion for an Interim Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
September 12, 2018 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2018 re #35 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ero.)(td)
September 10, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Attorney Shawn A. Latchford added to party Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Shawn A. Latchford added to party Uniloc USA, Inc.(pty:pla) (Latchford, Shawn)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING all pending and future nondispositive motions in this case related to the scope of venue discoveryto United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Setting Hearing on #35 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER : Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dl)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #35 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (dl)
August 16, 2018 Filing 35 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foster, James)
June 26, 2018 Filing 34 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., re #32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Declaration of James J. Foster, #22 Exhibit 1, #23 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
June 19, 2018 Filing 33 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 12, 2018, Proceedings Transcribed: Initial Pretrial Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/10/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2018, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
June 12, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc. (lt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2018: #1 Declaration of Michael Jaynes, #2 Declaration of John Guaragna, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Proposed Order) (lt).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion toTransfer Venue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay is LIFTED for the limited purpose of proceeding with Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue. Uniloc may file a response to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue on or before June 26th, 2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
June 12, 2018 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/12/2018. Minute entry documents are not available electronically. (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez) (dl)
May 30, 2018 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gannon, Kevin)
May 23, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Foster, James)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 6/12/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel and STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
May 9, 2018 Filing 26 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
May 9, 2018 Filing 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Mark D. Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Summer Torrez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
April 24, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Summer Torrez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10717974) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
April 24, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Mark D. Fowler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10717964) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
April 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 5/9/2018. (td)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Jonathan Hicks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Andrew Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Larissa Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Christine Corbett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
April 19, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Christine Corbett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10706367) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
April 19, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Larissa Park ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10706300) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
April 19, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Andrew Stein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10706294) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
April 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Jonathan Hicks ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10706284) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
April 18, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
April 13, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. Apple Inc. served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Nelson, Edward)
April 9, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (klw)
April 9, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/9/2018) (klw).
April 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron S. Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Jacobs, Aaron)
April 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin)
April 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony M. Vecchione on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Vecchione, Anthony)
April 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Nelson, Edward)
April 9, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (cj)
April 9, 2018 Filing 3 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with copy of Complaint. (cj)
April 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
April 9, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward)
April 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10658423), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 4/9/2018) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Summer Torrez
Represented By: Larissa Bifano
Represented By: Christine K Corbett
Represented By: Jonathan H Hicks
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Andrew N. Stein
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Represented By: Larissa Susan Bifano
Represented By: Christine Kerba Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNILOC Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?