Robertson v. City of Concord et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Robertson
Defendant: City of Concord and Ron Bruckert
Case Number: 3:2019cv01918
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #11 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue The CMC filed by Ron Bruckert, City of Concord and Joshua Robertson. (Blechman, Noah) (Filed on 6/27/2019) Modified on 6/27/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2019 Filing 10 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nold, Melissa) (Filed on 6/23/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Blechman, Noah) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Ron Bruckert, City of Concord. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF AMY S. ROTHMAN ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Proposed Order)(Rothman, Amy) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adante Pointer (Pointer, Adante) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ron Bruckert, City of Concord. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Nold, Melissa) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Joshua Robertson . (Nold, Melissa) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13246521.). Filed byJoshua Robertson. (Nold, Melissa) (Filed on 4/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. City of Concord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Robertson
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Concord
Represented By: Noah G. Blechman
Represented By: Amy S. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Bruckert
Represented By: Noah G. Blechman
Represented By: Amy S. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?