PS Products Inc et al v. ContextLogic Inc
Plaintiff: Billy Pennington and PS Products Inc
Defendant: ContextLogic Inc. and ContextLogic Inc. doing business as www.wish.com
Case Number: 3:2019cv02110
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2019 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ContextLogic Inc. ; granting with leave to amend #11 Motion to Dismiss. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Plaintiff's counsel to submit request to participate by telephone. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 35 Minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney: Chris Stewart. Defendant Attorneys: Chris Holland, Patience Ren. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2019)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 34 EXHIBITS re #33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13422474.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/10/2019 filed byPS Products Inc, Billy Pennington. (Related document(s) #33 ) (Stewart, Chris) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13422474.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/10/2019 filed by PS Products Inc, Billy Pennington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)(Stewart, Chris) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 #Electronic filing error re: #32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by PS Products Inc, Billy Pennington. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Mot ion fails to include a Certificate of Good Standing pursuant to L.R. 11-3(a). Please re-file. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13422474.) filed by PS Products Inc, Billy Pennington. (Stewart, Chris) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Christopher T. Holland (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to #29 Renotice, Motion Hearing re: set for #11 MOTION to Dismiss is set 6/20/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 29 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byContextLogic Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019) (mllS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ContextLogic Inc... (Holland, Christopher) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 24 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00896. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to immediately transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/17/2019. (ljb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case , #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ContextLogic Inc. (McPherson, Keith)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #19 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Accordingly, Defendant's reply, of no more than 7 pages, must be filed by 5 p.m., Tuesday, April 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/09/19. (dmm)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Motion to Transfer by ContextLogic Inc (McPherson, Keith)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case , #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stewart, Chris)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, the following deadlines are extended: Responses to Motions #11 and #13 due on or before 5:00 PM, April 5, 2019; Rule 26(f) conference deadlines is May 6, 2019; Rule 26(f) Report deadline is May 20, 2019; if necessary, parties can request for a Rule 16(b) Conference by May 28, 2019 and the Final Scheduling Order will be issued on or before June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/14/19. (mmb)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by ContextLogic Inc (McPherson, Keith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by ContextLogic Inc Request for Judical Notice in Support of Contextlogic, Inc. Motion to Dismiss (McPherson, Keith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Transfer Case filed by ContextLogic Inc. (McPherson, Keith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case by ContextLogic Inc (McPherson, Keith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion to Dismiss filed by ContextLogic Inc. (McPherson, Keith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by ContextLogic Inc (McPherson, Keith)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 and #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Christopher Todd Holland and Pei Hsien Ren are admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/25/19. (mmb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Pei Hsien "Patience" Ren. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3410393. Filed by ContextLogic Inc (McPherson, Keith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Christopher Holland. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3410383. Filed by ContextLogic Inc (McPherson, Keith)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/25/19. (dmm)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by ContextLogic Inc (McPherson, Keith)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/26/2019. Jury Trial set for 12/17/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/3/19. (mmb)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Defendant's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, February 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/02/19. (dmm)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ContextLogic Inc (McPherson, Keith)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by the Clerk of Court. (thd)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ContextLogic Inc filed by PS Products Inc, Billy Pennington. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT069804.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Docket text modified on 12/5/2018 to correct capitalization.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PS Products Inc et al v. ContextLogic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Pennington
Represented By: Chris H. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PS Products Inc
Represented By: Chris H. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ContextLogic Inc.
Represented By: Pei Hsien Patience Ren
Represented By: Christopher T. Holland
Represented By: Keith Martin McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ContextLogic Inc. doing business as www.wish.com
Represented By: Pei Hsien Patience Ren
Represented By: Christopher T. Holland
Represented By: Keith Martin McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?