Barger v. California
Petitioner: Sonny D. Barger, II and Gary Francis Fisher
Respondent: California
Case Number: 3:2019cv02177
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 RECEIPT OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT from USDC for the Eastern District of California -Live System as case 1:19-cv-00577, filed 05/02/2019. Re #5 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
April 30, 2019 The United States District Court for the Eastern District of California shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re #5 Order of Transfer (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/31/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR COUNSEL; by Sonny D. Barger, II. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FEE WAIVER; by Sonny D. Barger, II. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING). Filed bySonny D. Barger, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barger v. California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sonny D. Barger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Francis Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?