Facebook, Inc. et al v. Nollen et al
Plaintiff: Facebook Inc., Instagram, LLC and Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Leon Hedges and Social Media Series Limited
Case Number: 3:2019cv02262
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/08/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #39 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference and Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting to Vacate Case Management Conference, filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by Leon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Social Media Series Limited OF SETTLEMENT (Norton, William) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER continuing hearing as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing reset for 9/11/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/03/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Leon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Social Media Series Limited. (Norton, William) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion Hearing as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset for 9/4/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 15, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 12(b)(2) / Forum Non Conveniens. Motion Hearing reset for 8/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (Correction of scrivener's error in the clerk's notice which indicated the hearing date as 8/22/2019) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE - Reset hearing as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing reset for 8/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC re #32 Case Management Scheduling Order (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 7/19/2019) Modified on 7/22/2019 (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/19/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 12(b)(2) / Forum Non Conveniens ) filed byLeon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Social Media Series Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leon Hedges in Support of Reply, #2 Declaration of Gerard Dewar in Support of Reply)(Layton, Tyler) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 12(b)(2) / Forum Non Conveniens ) filed byFacebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jason J. Kim, #2 Declaration of Michelle Chan)(Kim, Jason) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Plaintiffs (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Norton, William) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting (as modified) #26 STIPULATION to extend deadlines re #23 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/10/2019. Replies due by 7/17/2019. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/24/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 12(b)(2) / Forum Non Conveniens for Continuance of Briefing Schedule and Hearing filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE - Reset Hearing as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Leon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Social Media Series Limited (Layton, Tyler) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 12(b)(2) / Forum Non Conveniens filed by Leon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Social Media Series Limited. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/26/2019. Replies due by 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Leon Hedges in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Arend Nollen in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration Declaration of David Pasanen in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Declaration Declaration of David Dewar in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Declaration Declaration of Fred Norton in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Layton, Tyler) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Leon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Social Media Series Limited.. (Layton, Tyler) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Leon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Social Media Series Limited. (Norton, William) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fred Norton, Jr (Norton, William) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fred Norton, Jr (Norton, William) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fred Norton, Jr (Norton, William) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fred Norton, Jr (Norton, William) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC of re 6 Case Assigned by Intake, re #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, re #1 Complaint, re #9 Summons Issued, re #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #7 Notice of Appearance, re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities on Defendant David Pasanen (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC of re 6 Case Assigned by Intake, re #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, re #1 Complaint, re #9 Summons Issued, re #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #7 Notice of Appearance, re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities on Defendant Leon Hedges (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC of re 6 Case Assigned by Intake, re #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, re #1 Complaint, re #9 Summons Issued, re #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #7 Notice of Appearance, re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities on Defendant Arend Nollen (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC of re 6 Case Assigned by Intake, re #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, re #1 Complaint, re #9 Summons Issued, re #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, re #7 Notice of Appearance, re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities on Defendant Social Media Series Limited (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, LLC.. (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendant Leon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen & Social Media Series Limited. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Jonathan Kim (Kim, Jason) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/10/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Instagram, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Facebook Inc. for Instagram, LLC. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc., Instagram, LLC (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Social Media Series Limited ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13292641.). Filed byFacebook Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-8, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 9-22, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Leon Hedges, Arend Nollen, David Pasanen, Social Media Series Limited, (Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13292641). Filed by Facebook, Inc. & Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibits 1-8, #(2) Exhibit Exhibits 9-22, #(3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 4/25/2019) Modified on 4/29/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. et al v. Nollen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Instagram, LLC
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Represented By: Jason Jonathan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Represented By: Jason Jonathan Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arend Nollen
Represented By: Bree Hann
Represented By: Tyler Mitchell Layton
Represented By: William Fred Norton, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew William Turetzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pasanen
Represented By: Bree Hann
Represented By: Tyler Mitchell Layton
Represented By: William Fred Norton, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew William Turetzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Hedges
Represented By: Bree Hann
Represented By: Tyler Mitchell Layton
Represented By: William Fred Norton, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew William Turetzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Media Series Limited
Represented By: Bree Hann
Represented By: Tyler Mitchell Layton
Represented By: William Fred Norton, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew William Turetzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?