Landrum v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: Dusty Landrum
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv02289
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review G eneral Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order for All Civil Cases Before District Judge Jon S. Tigar, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges, #(3) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 26, 2019 Answer to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint (Removal Complaint) by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons [N.D. Local Rule 3-15] filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CASE TO FEDERAL COURT from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 19-CIV-01735, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13296574). Filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Complaint, #(2) Exhibit B - Case Management Order, #(3) Exhibit C - Jetblue Answer to Complaint, #(4) Exhibit D - John Hallquest Declaration, #(5) Civil Cover Sheet)(Frederick, Andrew) (Filed on 4/26/2019) Modified on 5/2/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landrum v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Paul Frederick
Represented By: Brendan T Killeen
Represented By: Maureen Nicole Beckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dusty Landrum
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Jonathan Sing Lee
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Represented By: Robert Joseph Drexler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?