City of San Clemente et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through San Clemente City Attorney Scott C. Smith and City of San Clemente
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Allergan, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Actavis LLC, Allergan plc, Cardinal Health, Inc., David A. Sackler, Irene Sackler Lefcourt, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Jonathan D. Sackler, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. and Allergan Finance, LLC
Not Yet Classified: California Attorney General's Office
Case Number: 3:2019cv02326
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Related Case filed by California Attorney General's Office (Burkart, Michiyo) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STAYING ACTIONS PENDING JPML ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar.Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02307-JST, 3:19-cv-02320-JST, 3:19-cv-02321-JST, 3:19-cv-02323-JST, 3:19-cv-02324-JST, 3:19-cv-02325-JST, 3:19-cv-02326-JST(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 23 Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RELATING CASE 19-cv-2307-JST to 19-cv-02320-PJH,19-cv-02321-JD,19-cv-02323-RS,19-cv-02324-JST, 19-cv-02325-JD, 19-cv-02326-JSW. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #8 Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/13/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 19 Renotice motion hearing re #10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCity of San Clemente, THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through San Clemente City Attorney Scott C. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The Proper Event is Re-Notice. This Event can be Found Under: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Other Supporting Documents. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: #18 Notice (Other), filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through San Clemente City Attorney Scott C. Smith, City of San Clemente. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO REMAND re #11 Request for Judicial Notice, #10 MOTION to Remand by City of San Clemente, THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through San Clemente City Attorney Scott C. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/10/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019) Modified on 5/10/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 5/23/2019. Replies due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 05/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCity of San Clemente, THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through San Clemente City Attorney Scott C. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by City of San Clemente, THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through San Clemente City Attorney Scott C. Smith. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of San Clemente, THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through San Clemente City Attorney Scott C. Smith.. (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION)(Neglia, Ashley) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elizabeth Neglia on behalf of Allergan USA, Inc. (Neglia, Ashley) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) Modified on 5/1/2019 (cdnS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation Certificate of Interested Entities (Lu, Raymond) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-574868. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13301692). Filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Lu, Raymond) (Filed on 4/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of San Clemente et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Raymond Gin Lu
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Van Tassell
Represented By: Nathan E. Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through San Clemente City Attorney Scott C. Smith
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of San Clemente
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: California Attorney General's Office
Represented By: Michiyo Michelle Burkart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?