Barger v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Sonny Barger, II, Gary Dale Barger and Gary Francis Fisher
Defendant: EOP Sgt. Henderson, Scott Nicolas Gram, United States and Robert S. Mueller, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv02476
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Response to #4 Order to Show Cause by Sonny Barger, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Contemplated Dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
May 9, 2019 Added "aka Gary Francis Fisher" to plaintiff's mailing address.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/17/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sonny Barger, II. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Nicolas Gram, Henderson, Robert S. Mueller, III, United States (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Sonny Barger, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barger v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny Barger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Dale Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Francis Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOP Sgt. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Nicolas Gram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Mueller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?