Ping v. See's Candy Shops, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laci Ping
Defendant: See's Candies, Inc. and See's Candy Shops, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02504
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm A. Heinicke (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Forster NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Forster, Katherine) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by See's Candies, Inc., See's Candy Shops, Inc.. (Hayes, Cassidy) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassidy Hunter Hayes (Hayes, Cassidy) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laci Ping. re See's Candies, Inc. (James, Carey) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laci Ping. Laci Ping served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. re See's Candy Shops, Inc. (James, Carey) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to See's Candies, Inc., See's Candy Shops, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (James, Carey) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference.Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/14/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Laci Ping.. (James, Carey) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Laci Ping . (James, Carey) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/ 1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge. However, incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 02/19). Please complete correct Ci vil Cover Sheet of JS-CAND 44 (Rev 06/17) and re-file in its entirety as a separate docket entry Re: #1 .1]Complaint filed by laci ping (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/23/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13333120.). Filed by Laci Ping. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, Carey) (Filed on 5/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ping v. See's Candy Shops, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See's Candies, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm A. Heinicke
Represented By: Cassidy Hunter Hayes
Represented By: Katherine M. Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See's Candy Shops, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm A. Heinicke
Represented By: Cassidy Hunter Hayes
Represented By: Katherine M. Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laci Ping
Represented By: Carey A James
Represented By: Brent A Robinson
Represented By: Randall Bruce Aiman-Smith
Represented By: Hallie Von Rock
Represented By: Reed W. L. Marcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?