Kerry v. Quantenna Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Kerry
Defendant: Mark A. Stevens, Quantenna Communications, Inc., Edwin B. Hooper III, Dr. Sam Heidari, Glenda Mary Dorchak, Harold E. Hughes Jr., John Scull and Jack R. Lazar
Case Number: 3:2019cv02535
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark Kerry (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Mark Kerry of Announcement of Filing of a Class Action Lawsuit Against Quantenna Communications, Inc. as Required by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 and Civil L. R. 23-1(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Kerry. Service waived by Mark A. Stevens waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Kerry. Service waived by John Scull waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Kerry. Service waived by Quantenna Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Kerry. Service waived by Jack R. Lazar waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Kerry. Service waived by Harold E. Hughes Jr. waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Kerry. Service waived by Edwin B. Hooper III waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Kerry. Service waived by Dr. Sam Heidari waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mark Kerry. Service waived by Glenda Mary Dorchak waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION SEC Class Action Notice due by 5/31/2019. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Re: #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Please disregard issued in error. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Glenda Mary Dorchak, Dr. Sam Heidari, Edwin B. Hooper III, Harold E. Hughes Jr., Jack R. Lazar, Quantenna Communications, Inc., John Scull, Mark A. Stevens. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Benjamin Heikali on behalf of Mark Kerry (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark Kerry (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of Sections 14(a) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934; Jury Trial Demanded against Glenda Mary Dorchak, Dr. Sam Heidari, Edwin B. Hooper III, Harold E. Hughes Jr., Jack R. Lazar, Quantenna Communications, Inc., John Scull, Mark A. Stevens (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13339437.). Filed by Mark Kerry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerry v. Quantenna Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantenna Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin B. Hooper III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sam Heidari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Mary Dorchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold E. Hughes Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Scull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R. Lazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kerry
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Nadeem Faruqi
Represented By: James M. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?