N.A. Sales Company, Inc. v. Kim
Appellant: N.A. Sales Company, Inc.
Appellee: John Yi Soo Kim
Case Number: 3:2019cv02536
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-19-832-JSC. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/27/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 OBJECTIONS to re #1 Withdrawal of Reference, by John Yi Soo Kim. (Leader-Picone, Malcolm) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court Bankruptcy Court case number 19-4024 Judge Charles Novack.. Filed byN.A. Sales Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 motion part 2, #2 transmittal, #3 docket sheet)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.A. Sales Company, Inc. v. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: N.A. Sales Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Huibum Song
Represented By: Inna Nam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Yi Soo Kim
Represented By: Malcolm Leader-Picone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?